Roberts et al v. Meta Platforms, Inc.
Plaintiff: Amanda Roberts, Wendy Brownlee, Body Recovery 2U, LLC, George Corey, Kamryn Corey, Peyton Montgomery, Kara Montgomery and Linda Roberts
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc. and Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv01572
Filed: November 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 19 RESPONSE to re (13 in 2:23-cv-01581-ACA), (15 in 2:23-cv-01572-ACA), (10 in 2:23-cv-01590-ACA) Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., Meta Platforms Inc. Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-01572-ACA, 2:23-cv-01580-ACA, 2:23-cv-01581-ACA, 2:23-cv-01590-ACA(Olson, Lana)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER The court GRANTS Meta's motion to consolidate. (Doc. 11). The court DIRECTS the Clerk to reassign Burns v. Meta Platforms, Inc., 4:23-cv- 01580-CLM and Schatz v. Meta Platforms, Inc., 2:23-cv-01581-MHH to the undersigned. Further, the court CONSOLIDATES the three above-styled matters (Burns v. Meta Platforms, Inc., 4:23-cv-01580-CLM; Schatz v. Meta Platforms, Inc., 2:23-cv-01581-MHH; and Bolden v. Meta Platforms, Inc., 7:23-cv- 01590-ACA) with Roberts v. Meta Platforms, Inc., 2:23-cv-01572-ACA. The court DIRECTS the parties to file all documents under case number 2:23- cv-01572-ACA and to use the style that appears in this order. The caption of any pleading or motion should indicate by case number whether the filing pertains to one particular case or all three cases. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/10/2024. (RMM)
December 20, 2023 Filing 17 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiffs Body Recovery 2U, LLC, Wendy Brownlee, Kamryn Corey, George Corey, Kara Montgomery, Peyton Montgomery, Amanda Roberts, Linda Roberts re: #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Body Recovery 2U, LLC, Wendy Brownlee, Kamryn Corey, George Corey, Kara Montgomery, Peyton Montgomery, Amanda Roberts, Linda Roberts. (Daniel, Jeffrey)
December 15, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Stay (Opposed) filed by Wendy Brownlee, Kamryn Corey, George Corey, Kara Montgomery, Peyton Montgomery, Amanda Roberts, Linda Roberts. (Daniel, Jeffrey)
December 14, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay (Opposed) by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Olson, Lana)
December 14, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause filed by Wendy Brownlee, Kamryn Corey, George Corey, Kara Montgomery, Peyton Montgomery, Amanda Roberts, Linda Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: scheduling order from JPML, #2 Exhibit B: JPML Order for remand and vacate)(Daniel, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2023 Filing 13 Opposition to re #4 (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Olson, Lana)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The plaintiffs are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE on or before December 15, 2023 why the motion to consolidate (doc. 11) should not be granted. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 12/5/2023. (RMM)
November 30, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Pretrial and Discovery Purposes by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Olson, Lana)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER re #4 Motion to Remand - Defendant's response is due on or before December 13, 2023; plaintiffs' reply, if any, is due on or before December 20, 2023. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/29/23. (SAC)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc.'s #5 motion to stay the responsive pleading deadline until fourteen days after the court rules on the plaintiffs' motion to remand the case. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/27/2023. (RMM)
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Body Recovery 2U, LLC, Wendy Brownlee, Kamryn Corey, George Corey, Kara Montgomery, Peyton Montgomery, Amanda Roberts, Linda Roberts. (Daniel, Jeffrey)
November 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/26/23. (SAC)
November 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER - The court GRANTS #3 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for attorney Timothy W. Loose. The Clerk's Office sends all orders and court notices to counsel electronically. If not already registered, attorney shall register for a PACER account. He may then request filing privileges for this court through the PACER website. Subsequently, he may enter a notice of appearance in this case. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/26/23. (SAC)
November 24, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Olson, Lana)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Body Recovery 2U, LLC, Wendy Brownlee, Kamryn Corey, George Corey, Kara Montgomery, Peyton Montgomery, Amanda Roberts, Linda Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, #2 Exhibit Exh B)(Daniel, Jeffrey)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Timothy W. Loose by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Olson, Lana)
November 21, 2023 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number BALNDC-4474166. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Meta Platforms, Inc. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number 58-cv-2023-900739, filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(RMM). (Olson, Lana) ALND receipt B-8629 Modified on 11/21/2023 (RMM).
November 21, 2023 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4474191. (Olson, Lana) ALND receipt B-8627 Modified on 11/21/2023 (RMM). Modified on 11/21/2023 (RMM).
November 20, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Meta Platforms, Inc. (RMM)
November 20, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Meta Platforms, Inc. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number 58-cv-2023-900739, filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(RMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts et al v. Meta Platforms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Represented By: M Wesley Smithart
Represented By: Lana Alcorn Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Lana Alcorn Olson
Represented By: M Wesley Smithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Roberts
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Brownlee
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Body Recovery 2U, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Corey
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamryn Corey
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peyton Montgomery
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Montgomery
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Roberts
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?