Bolden et al v. Robertson et al
Plaintiff: Coasondra Bolden, Saaron Smith, Monica Barton, Leona Blount, Kiera Bolden, Kathy Daniels, Randy Daniels and LaToya Witherspoon
Defendant: James Robertson, Meta Platforms Inc and Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv01590
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE to re (13 in 2:23-cv-01581-ACA), (15 in 2:23-cv-01572-ACA), (10 in 2:23-cv-01590-ACA) Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., Meta Platforms Inc. Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-01572-ACA, 2:23-cv-01580-ACA, 2:23-cv-01581-ACA, 2:23-cv-01590-ACA(Olson, Lana)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER The court GRANTS Meta's motion to consolidate. (Doc. 11). The court DIRECTS the Clerk to reassign Burns v. Meta Platforms, Inc., 4:23-cv- 01580-CLM and Schatz v. Meta Platforms, Inc., 2:23-cv-01581-MHH to the undersigned. Further, the court CONSOLIDATES the three above-styled matters (Burns v. Meta Platforms, Inc., 4:23-cv-01580-CLM; Schatz v. Meta Platforms, Inc., 2:23-cv-01581-MHH; and Bolden v. Meta Platforms, Inc., 7:23-cv- 01590-ACA) with Roberts v. Meta Platforms, Inc., 2:23-cv-01572-ACA. The court DIRECTS the parties to file all documents under case number 2:23- cv-01572-ACA and to use the style that appears in this order. The caption of any pleading or motion should indicate by case number whether the filing pertains to one particular case or all three cases. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/10/2024. (RMM)
December 27, 2023 Filing 13 REPLY to re #8 in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Monica Barton, Leona Blount, Coasondra Bolden, Kiera Bolden, Kathy Daniels, Randy Daniels, James Robertson, Saaron Smith, LaToya Witherspoon. (Daniel, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Meta Platforms Inc. (Olson, Lana)
December 15, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Stay (Opposed) filed by Monica Barton, Leona Blount, Coasondra Bolden, Kiera Bolden, Kathy Daniels, Randy Daniels, James Robertson, Saaron Smith, LaToya Witherspoon. (Daniel, Jeffrey)
December 14, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay (Opposed) by Meta Platforms Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Olson, Lana)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER re #8 Motion to Remand to State Court - Defendant's response is due on or before December 21, 2023; a reply, if any, is due on or before December 29, 2023. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 12/7/23. (SAC)
December 6, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Monica Barton, Leona Blount, Coasondra Bolden, Kiera Bolden, Kathy Daniels, Randy Daniels, James Robertson, Saaron Smith, LaToya Witherspoon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Daniel, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc.'s #4 motion to stay the responsive pleading deadline until fourteen days after the court rules on the plaintiffs' forthcoming motion to remand the case. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/27/2023. (RMM)
November 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/26/23. (SAC)
November 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER - The court GRANTS #3 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for attorney Timothy Loose. The Clerk's Office sends all orders and court notices to counsel electronically. If not already registered, attorney shall register for a PACER account. He may then request filing privileges for this court through the PACER website. Subsequently, he may enter a notice of appearance in this case. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/26/23. (SAC)
November 24, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Meta Platforms Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Olson, Lana)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Timothy Loose by Meta Platforms Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Olson, Lana)
November 22, 2023 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4475529. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Meta Platforms Inc from Tuscaloosa County Circuit Court, case number 2023-90941., filed by Meta Platforms Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KAM). (Olson, Lana) ALND receipt B-8687 Modified on 11/27/2023 (RMM).
November 22, 2023 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4475532. (Olson, Lana) ALND receipt B-8688 Modified on 11/27/2023 (RMM).
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Meta Platforms Inc (KAM)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Meta Platforms Inc from Tuscaloosa County Circuit Court, case number 2023-90941., filed by Meta Platforms Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolden et al v. Robertson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coasondra Bolden
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saaron Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Barton
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leona Blount
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiera Bolden
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Daniels
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Daniels
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaToya Witherspoon
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Robertson
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms Inc
Represented By: Lana Alcorn Olson
Represented By: M Wesley Smithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Lana Alcorn Olson
Represented By: M Wesley Smithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?