Slater v. Marine Management Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Archie Slater
Defendant: Marine Management Services Inc, Crowley Marine Services, Inc., Shell Exploration & Production Company and Shell Offshore, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv01604
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30104
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER- The parties are ORDERED to show cause within FOURTEEN DAYS of this order why the motion to dismiss filed by Plaintiff Archie Lee Slater in 23-632, #14 , should not be mooted in light of the consolidation of the two cases. The court reserves ruling on the unopposed motion for extension of time to effect service, #26 , pending responses to the show cause order. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 01/17/2024. Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-00632-AMM, 2:23-cv-01604-AMM(AKD)
January 10, 2024 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Effect Service by Archie Slater. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-00632-AMM, 2:23-cv-01604-AMM(Whitmore, David)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER-Accordingly, the court ORDERS the consolidation of the two cases (2:23 CV 1604 AMM). All filings in either case should be filed in the docket for this case.. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 12/18/2023. Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-00632-AMM, 2:23-cv-01604-AMM(AKD)
December 18, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE OF CONSOLIDATION- The above-styled civil actions have been consolidated. Please use the above case style on all subsequent pleadings. Please electronically file all future pleadings in the LEAD CASE number 2:23 CV 632 AMM. The electronic system will automatically add the entry in the member case. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. (AKD)
November 28, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
November 27, 2023 Filing 30 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:23-cv-01708. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that the Defendants' #9 , #10 motions for transfer are GRANTED. This matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 11/21/2023.(pp) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
October 18, 2023 Filing 28 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Crowley Marine Services, Inc., Marine Management Services, Inc., Shell Offshore, Inc. filed by Archie Slater.(cs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/18/2023. (cs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Shell Exploration & Production Company dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/18/2023. (cs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
October 17, 2023 Filing 25 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Archie Slater. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Whitmore, David) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
October 17, 2023 Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Shell Exploration & Production Company by Archie Slater. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Whitmore, David) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
October 11, 2023 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Marine Management Services, Inc. re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case or, Alternatively MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (cs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Reply memorandum. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/11/2023. (cs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
October 11, 2023 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Crowley Marine Services, Inc. re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Joinder in MMSI's Motion to Transfer. (cs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Reply memorandum. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/11/2023. (cs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
October 10, 2023 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Joinder in MMSI's Motion to Transfer by Crowley Marine Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Sensenbrenner, Erica) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
October 10, 2023 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer and Motion to Dismiss by Marine Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Sensenbrenner, Erica) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
October 4, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE: Because R. Docs. #15 contain more than 50 pages, counsel shall deliver to chambers within 3 working days one hard copy of each submission in separate binders as set forth in notice. Signed by Clerk.(bwn) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
October 3, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Archie Slater re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Joinder in MMSI's Motion to Transfer . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Crowley Corporate Records, #2 Exhibit CM/ECF info re Crowley)(Whitmore, David) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
October 3, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Archie Slater re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case or, Alternatively MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer Shell Offshore No. 22-67, #2 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss, USDC, NDAL, #3 Exhibit Briefing Schedule, USDC, NDAL, #4 Exhibit LA SOS Records, MMSI, #5 Exhibit MMSI Homepage, #6 Exhibit Job Listings)(Whitmore, David) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Filing 14 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Crowley Marine Services, Inc., Marine Management Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Crowley Maritime Corporation for Crowley Marine Services, Inc., Marine Management Services, Inc. (Sensenbrenner, Erica)[Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Filing 13 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Shell Exploration & Production Company identifying Corporate Parent Shell plc for Shell Exploration & Production Company (Baynham, Alexander) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 7.1, nongovernmental corporate parties must file a disclosure statement with their first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. IT IS ORDERED that any nongovernmental corporate parties in this matter file the required disclosure statement within seven (7) days of this order. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
September 25, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, by Shell Exploration & Production Company.Attorney Alexander J Baynham added to party Shell Exploration & Production Company(pty:dft).(Baynham, Alexander) Modified text on 9/26/2023 (cs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
September 25, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Joinder in MMSI's Motion to Transfer by Crowley Marine Services, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Notice of Submission)Attorney Erica Sensenbrenner added to party Crowley Marine Services, Inc.(pty:dft).(Sensenbrenner, Erica) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
September 25, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case or, Alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Marine Management Services, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Notice of Submission)Attorney Erica Sensenbrenner added to party Marine Management Services, Inc.(pty:dft).(Sensenbrenner, Erica) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
September 8, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Archie Slater re #7 Order to Show Cause,, (Whitmore, David) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Plaintiff: IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff move for entry of default against said defendant under Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or show good cause in writing within 20 days why these defendant should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. If counsel for the plaintiff fails to move for entry of default or show good cause in writing, the aforementioned defendant will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute without further notice in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 08/25/2023.(cs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
July 26, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Shell Exploration & Production Company served on 7/25/2023, answer due 8/15/2023. (Whitmore, David) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
June 20, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Crowley Marine Services, Inc. on 6/12/2023, answer due 8/11/2023; Marine Management Services, Inc. on 6/12/2023, answer due 8/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Waiver - Crowley)(Whitmore, David) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
May 23, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED SEAMAN COMPLAINT against Crowley Marine Services, Inc., Marine Management Services, Inc., Shell Exploration & Production Company filed by Archie Slater.(Whitmore, David) Modified on 5/23/2023 (pp). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
May 22, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Crowley Marine Services, Inc., Marine Management Services, Inc., Shell Exploration & Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(pp) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
May 19, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
May 19, 2023 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT against Crowley Marine Services, Inc., Marine Management Services, Inc., Shell Exploration & Production Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9944428) filed by Crowley Marine Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney David Christopher Whitmore added to party Crowley Marine Services, Inc.(pty:dft).(Whitmore, David) Modified on 5/23/2023 (pp). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slater v. Marine Management Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archie Slater
Represented By: Lawrence Blake Jones
Represented By: David Christopher Whitmore
Represented By: David C Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Management Services Inc
Represented By: Matthew C Guy
Represented By: Francis V Liantonio, Jr
Represented By: Erica Sensenbrenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowley Marine Services, Inc.
Represented By: Francis V Liantonio, Jr
Represented By: Erica Sensenbrenner
Represented By: Matthew C Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Exploration & Production Company
Represented By: Thomas Pollard Diaz
Represented By: Alexander J Baynham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Offshore, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?