Ferguson v. Gaines et al
Plaintiff: Willie Howard Ferguson
Defendant: Officer Raymond Lewis Gaines, Officer Quincy Jones, Warden Gwendolyn Givens, Warden Phyllis Morgan, Warden Vencini Smith and Quinton Jackson
Case Number: 2:2024cv00251
Filed: February 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Nicholas A Danella
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Gwendolyn Givens, Phyllis Morgan, Vencini Smith. (Sims, Hunter)
April 12, 2024 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie Howard Ferguson. Raymond Lewis Gaines served on 3/22/2024, answer due 4/12/2024. (Gochett, Kristen)
April 12, 2024 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie Howard Ferguson. Phyllis Morgan served on 3/22/2024, answer due 4/12/2024. (Gochett, Kristen)
April 12, 2024 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie Howard Ferguson. Vencini Smith served on 3/22/2024, answer due 4/12/2024. (Gochett, Kristen) Modified on 4/12/2024 (LCB).
April 12, 2024 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Stay filed by Raymond Lewis Gaines. (Dawson, William)
April 12, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Stay filed by Willie Howard Ferguson. (Gochett, Kristen)
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: Counsel for the plaintiff is ORDERED to file any opposition, stipulation, or response to Defendant Officer Raymond Lewis Gaines' motion to stay #13 on or before Friday, April 12, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 4/8/2024. (AHI)
April 5, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay by Raymond Lewis Gaines. (Dawson, William)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #11 Motion for Extension of Time and Defendants Givens, Morgan, and Smith are allowed until 4/19/2024, in which to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 4/2/2024. (AHI)
April 1, 2024 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Gwendolyn Givens, Phyllis Morgan, Vencini Smith. (Sims, Hunter)
March 25, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie Howard Ferguson. Gwendolyn Givens served on 3/23/2024, answer due 4/13/2024. (Gochett, Kristen)
March 20, 2024 Filing 9 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to Quinton Jackson. (AHI)
March 18, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Willie Howard Ferguson.(Gochett, Kristen)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the #3 Motion to Amend Party Name. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 3/18/2024. (AHI)
March 15, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie Howard Ferguson. Raymond Lewis Gaines served on 3/9/2024, answer due 3/30/2024. (Gochett, Kristen)
March 15, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie Howard Ferguson. Phyllis Morgan served on 3/11/2024, answer due 4/1/2024. (Gochett, Kristen)
March 15, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie Howard Ferguson. Vencini Smith served on 3/11/2024, answer due 4/1/2024. (Gochett, Kristen)
March 12, 2024 Filing 3 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Party Name by Willie Howard Ferguson. (Gochett, Kristen)
March 7, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff's counsel for service as to Raymond Lewis Gaines, Gwendolyn Givens, Phyllis Morgan, and Vencini Smith. (AHI)
March 1, 2024 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number CALNDC-4540456 (B-10319). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Willie Howard Ferguson.(AHI). (Maxwell, Leroy) Modified on 3/4/2024 (AHI).
February 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Willie Howard Ferguson.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Gaines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Howard Ferguson
Represented By: Kristen Elyse Gochett
Represented By: Leroy Maxwell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Raymond Lewis Gaines
Represented By: William M Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Quincy Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Gwendolyn Givens
Represented By: Hunter Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Phyllis Morgan
Represented By: Hunter Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Vencini Smith
Represented By: Hunter Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinton Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?