Domoromo v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Maryori Ediluz Escalona Domoromo
Defendant: Ur M Jaddou, Debra A Rogers and Alejandro Mayorkas
Case Number: 2:2024cv01280
Filed: September 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act / Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2024 Filing 8 Alias Summons Issued as to Ur M Jaddou. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (AKD)
October 1, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Ur M Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Debra A Rogers, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (AKD)
September 27, 2024 PHV Fee paid: $ 100, receipt number AALNDC-4688883 (ALND receipt# B-13941). Paid on behalf of Amir Ahmad Naim. (Naim, Amir) Modified on 9/27/2024 (AKD).
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to file this action without prepayment of a fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 09/25/2024. (AKD)
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Presently pending is the motion to allow Amir Naim to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the plaintiff. (Doc. #3 ). The motion, which includes the information required under Local Rule 83.1, is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED, subject to payment of the required $100 fee within seven calendar days. This conditional grant of pro hac vice status will become final without further court order once the fee is paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 09/25/2024. (AKD)
September 25, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 9/25/2024. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Maryori Ediluz Escalona Domoromo. (Naim, Amir)
September 24, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff Maryori Ediluz Escalona Domoromo Motion is RIPE 9/24/2024. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Maryori Ediluz Escalona Domoromo. (Naim, Amir)
September 20, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
September 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ur M Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Debra A Rogers, filed by Maryori Ediluz Escalona Domoromo.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Domoromo v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra A Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryori Ediluz Escalona Domoromo
Represented By: Natasha V Snow
Represented By: Amir Ahmad Naim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?