Riverside Texaco et al v. Occidental Chemical Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Alma Hampton, Thomas L Hampton, Virginia Hampton, Walter Hampton, Thomas L Haney, Mary L Harris, Russell Harris, John L Hayes, Romelia C Hogan, Leo Hollingsworth, Sr, Gwendolyn Hood, Ester Horrison, Doris L Howard, Lydia F Howard, Leotha Ingram, Jr, Hollis Isbell, Craig Jackson, James L Jackson, Jerita Jackson, Walter Jackson, Jr, Albert L Jarmon, Charles Jarmon, Janice Jarmon, Sabrina Jarmon, Veronica Jarmon, Barbara Johnson, Governor O Johnson, Jr, Irene Johnson, Linda M Johnson, Willie Johnson, Jr, Gary D Jones, John Jones, Jr, Rosie L Jones, Ruby E Jones, Ruby Elaine Jones, Willie B Jones, Percy L Kimbrough, David King, Devon King, Emmitt King, Jr, Emmitt King, Sr, Glenda W King, Janice H King, Kent King, Willie H King, Doris Knox, Michael W Landers, Gary L Ledlow, Carol A Lesley, Dean Lesley, Dickey G Lesley, William R Lewis, Kenny D Liles, Rhonda Lindsey, Jessie J Little, Joseph Little, Sr, Katrina Little, Mark Little, Willie J Little, Sr, Henry M Long, Sherry Long, Lillian T Mars, Lorene Martin, Marion L Martin, Mary G Mastin, Andrew J Mayes, John R Mayes, Mildred Mayes, Ester McAfee, Elizabeth McDaniel, Charlie McDuffle, Jr, Emma McGaha, Margaret McNeece, Edna T McPherson, Michael Meade, Shirley Meadows, Sadell Meredith, Weston C Metcalf, Marion D Mims, Sabrina Mitchell, Sarah W Mitchell, Wanda R Mitchell, Jo C Montgomery, Ella Moss, Gail W Mullens, Isaiah Neloms, Jr, Isaiah Neloms, III, Otis Neloms, Percy L Neloms, Simon Neloms, William M Neloms, Clyde W Newsome, Robert Newsome, Jr, Towanda Nixon, Gloria Oliver, Marie Owen, Andrew Pearsall, Mattie Penn, Natalie B Peters, Dorothy L Phillips, Edward W Phillips, Scott G Phillips, Willie Phillips, Zela M Phillips, Robert Poellnitz, Patricia Pounders, Howard Pratt, Bobby A Pruitt, Edgar E Pruitt, Karel Pruitt, Shelia Pullen, Mariko Redcross, Riley D Reels, Mary H Ricks, Richard Ricks, William D Ricks, Beverly Ross, Judge D Royal, Mattie Russell, Queen E Rutland, Ollie Sanders, Jr, Virginia K Sanders, Lugertha Sharpley, Bessie Smith, Dora B Smith, Horace J Smith, Larry D Smith, Margaret Smith, Rosa Smith, Vinson T Smith, William M Smith, Robert E Speegle, Richard C Stanley, Kenneth Stowe, Lucille B Suttle, Patricia G Terry, Lucille P Thomas, Alonzo Thompson, Aneitha Thompson, Annie P Thompson, Cecelia Thompson, Claiborn B Thompson, Leatha A Thompson, Robert E Thompson, Tammie Tidwell, Dayle A Turner, Nazery B Turner, Claude B Vernon, Jr, Charles E Vess, Donna Vinson, Greg Vinson, Nellie P Vinson, Hilda B Warren, Mildred W Warren, Minnie L Warren, Frank Watson, David Watts, Dexter B Watts, Oscar O Watts, Jr, Oscar O Watts, III, Michael Weakley, Ollie Weaver, Rosie L West, Patsy White, Annie R Whiteside, Carol A Whiteside, Eddie Whiteside, James Whiteside, Jr, Terilyn Whiteside, John A Williams, Lula M Williams, Ruthie P Williams and Riley L Young
Case Number: 3:2007cv00268
Filed: February 8, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Colbert
Presiding Judge: Inge P Johnson
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER finding as moot #259 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 10/13/2009. (KSS, )
October 12, 2009 Filing 259 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by plas. (Boutwell, Christopher) Modified on 10/15/2009 (ASL ).
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER due to an error in the dates, the court's #257 Order on Motion to Dismiss is WITHDRAWN and the following substituted therefore as set out; it is ORDERED by the court that said motion is GRANTED, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 10/5/2009. (KSS, )
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER granting #254 Motion to Dismiss; this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 10/1/2009. (KAM, )
September 15, 2009 Filing 256 NOTICE filed by plas re #255 Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Addison, Alyce) Modified on 9/15/2009 (ASL ).
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #254 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice : Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2009 08:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Inge P Johnson. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 9/11/09. (ASL )
September 10, 2009 Filing 254 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreed Stipulation of Facts)(Wetmore, Michael)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER scheduling a Status Conference for 9/3/2009 at 01:30 PM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Inge P Johnson. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 8/27/09. (ASL )
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice, court retains jurisdiction for purpose of enforcing parties' settlement agreement, parties shall submit formal stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 4/21/09. (ASL )
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER granting #250 Motion for enlargement of time to reply; plas are allowed an additional 7 days to respond to pending motions. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 4/17/09. (ASL )
April 16, 2009 Filing 250 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #223 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts Richard A. Maloy, Dennis W. Key and G. Barton Crum, pursuant to Daubert, #227 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment in the Alternative to Doc. #224, #229 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert William Desmond pursuant to Daubert by plas. (Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 4/17/2009 (ASL, ).
April 16, 2009 Filing 249 Transcript of Status Hearing held on 10/2/07, before Judge Inge P. Johnson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karla Johnson. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (#See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 5/7/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/18/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2009. (ASL, )
April 14, 2009 Filing 248 RESPONSE in Opposition to #245 plas' MOTION to reconsider #238 Order granting dft's Daubert motion and/or to supplement the expert opinions of John Schendel and Harry Ellis filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Wetmore, Michael) Modified on 4/14/2009 (ASL ).
April 13, 2009 Filing 247 Brief re #246 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment to Prior Motion for Full Summary Judgment Given Plaintiffs' Lack of Requisite Scientific/Expert Causation Evidence filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Wetmore, Michael)
April 13, 2009 Filing 246 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment to Prior Motion for Full Summary Judgment by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Wetmore, Michael)
April 13, 2009 Filing 245 MOTION for Reconsideration re #238 Order on Motion in Limine Against Plaintiffs' Experts John Schendel and Harry Ellis, and Motion for Leave to Supplement Expert Opinion of John Schedel and Harry Ellis or, in the Alternative, Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File New Motion for Full Summary Judgment and/or to Supplement Prior Motion for Full Summary Judgment Post-Daubert Ruling by plas. (Boutwell, Christopher) Modified on 4/14/2009 (ASL ).
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting #243 Motion for Leave to File New Motion for Full Summary Judgment and/or to Supplement its Prior Motion for full Summary Judgment Post-Daubert Ruling, it is further ORDERED that the plas' time to respond to said motion and dft's time to reply to plas' response are extended accordingly. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 4/13/2009. (KSS, )
April 9, 2009 Filing 243 MOTION for Leave to File New Motion for Full Summary Judgment and/or to Supplement its Prior Motion for Full Summary Judgment Post-Daubert Ruling by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion for Full Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit B - Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Full Summary Judgment)(Wetmore, Michael)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER re #239 Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Defendant's Expert Witness, M.Whitman Beasley, Jr. and #240 Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Defendant's Expert Witness John W. Trimble; dft is allowed 21 days to respond to said motions. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 4/7/09. (ASL )
April 7, 2009 Filing 241 NOTICE that although the court does not find conflict pursuant to 28:455, the court notifies counsel that, at present time, M. Whitman Beasley, Jr., serves as expert witness for State of Alabama in condemnation proceedings in 31st Judicial Circuit, AL; said condemnation proceedings are prosecuted on behalf of State of Alabama by undersigned's husband. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 4/7/09. (ASL )
April 6, 2009 Filing 240 Proposed MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Defendant's Expert Witness John W. Trimble by plas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-!, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 4/7/2009 (ASL ).
April 6, 2009 Filing 239 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Defendant's Expert Witness, M.Whitman Beasley, Jr. by plas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Boutwell, Christopher) Modified on 4/7/2009 (ASL ).
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting #176 Motion to exclude plas' experts John Schendel and Harry V. Ellis, III. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 4/6/09. (ASL )
March 27, 2009 Filing 237 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry H Self, Jr on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation (Self, Henry)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting #226 Motion for leave to file memorandum of law in support of partial summary judgment in excess of page limitation. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 3/24/09. (ASL )
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting #233 Motion for an enlargement of time to respond to dft's motions; plas shall have an add'l 16 days to respond to each of dft's motions. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 3/24/09. (ASL )
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting #221 Motion for leave to file Daubert motion in excess of page limitations. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 3/23/09. (ASL )
March 23, 2009 Filing 233 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #223 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts Richard A. Maloy, Dennis W. Key and G. Barton Crum, pursuant to Daubert, #224 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #227 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment in the Alternative to Doc. #224, #229 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert William Desmond pursuant to Daubert by plas. (Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 3/24/2009 (ASL, ).
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER re #229 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert William Desmond pursuant to Daubert filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation; plas are ORDERED to respond to said motion w/i 14 days. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 3/23/09. (ASL )
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting #220 Motion to Withdraw Gilbert P. Self as Attorney. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 3/23/09. (ASL )
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting #222 joint motion for extension of time to allow plas to file motions challenging dft's experts or expert testimony; plas shall have 10 days following depo of each of dft's remaining experts in which to file any motion challenging that expert or the expert's testimony. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 3/23/09. (ASL )
March 21, 2009 Filing 229 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert William Desmond pursuant to Daubert by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Depo Transcript - Desmond), #2 Exhibit B (Mercury Study Report to Congress), #3 Exhibit C (Depo Transcript - Hoffnagle))(Wetmore, Michael)
March 20, 2009 Filing 228 Brief re #227 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment in the Alternative to Doc. #224. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Carolyn Alford Interrogatory Response), #2 Exhibit 2 (Thomas Burgess Interrogatory Response), #3 Exhibit 3 (Thomas Hampton Interrogatory Response), #4 Exhibit 4 (Craig Jackson Interrogatory Response), #5 Exhibit 5 (Charles Jarmon Interrogatory Response), #6 Errata 6 (Willie J. Jonrrogatory Response), #7 Exhibit 7 (Gary Ludlow Interrogatory Response), #8 Exhibit 8 (Carlos McMullins Interrogatory Response), #9 Exhibit 9 (Ella Moss Interrogatory Response), #10 Exhibit 10 )Simon Neloms Interrogatory Response), #11 Exhibit 11 (Gladys Pullen Interrogatory Response), #12 Exhibit 12 (Riverside Texaco Interrogatory Response))(Wetmore, Michael)
March 20, 2009 Filing 227 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment in the Alternative to Doc. #224 by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Wetmore, Michael)
March 20, 2009 Filing 226 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Brief in Support of Partial Motion for Summary Judgment by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Wetmore, Michael)
March 20, 2009 Filing 225 Brief re #224 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A ( ADEM Environmental Indicator Evaluation, #2 Exhibit B (EPA Detailed Facility Report), #3 Exhibit C (Muscle Shoals Environmental Awards-Recognition, #4 Exhibit D (Barbara Beck Expert Report), #5 Exhibit E (Desmond Expert Report), #6 Exhibit F (Supplemental Expert Report of Wm. Hall), #7 Exhibit G (Depo Transcript - Ellis), #8 Exhibit H (Depo Transcript - Desmond), #9 Exhibit I (Tort Litigation Reporter), #10 Exhibit J (List of Plaintiffs with concentrations at or below 0.0732 ppm))(Wetmore, Michael)
March 20, 2009 Filing 224 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Wetmore, Michael)
March 20, 2009 Filing 223 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts Richard A. Maloy, Dennis W. Key and G. Barton Crum, pursuant to Daubert by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit B)(Wetmore, Michael)
March 20, 2009 Filing 222 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Allow Plaintiffs to File Motions Challenging Defendant's Experts or Expert Testimony by plas. (Boutwell, Christopher) Modified on 3/20/2009 (ASL, ).
March 20, 2009 Filing 221 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Wetmore, Michael)
March 20, 2009 Filing 220 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Self, Gilbert)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER finding as moot #217 Motion for leave to file reply in support of dft's Daubert motion in excess of page limitation. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 3/13/09. (ASL, )
March 11, 2009 Filing 218 REPLY to Response to Motion re #176 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts John Schendel and Harry Ellis, III pursuant to Rule 702 and/or Daubert filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charts, #2 Exhibit B - Graph)(Wetmore, Michael)
March 11, 2009 Filing 217 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Defendant's Daubert Motion in Excess of Page Limitation by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Wetmore, Michael)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting #215 Motion for leave to file reply in support of Daubert motion; dft is allowed until 3/11/09 to submit a reply. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 3/9/09. (ASL, )
March 6, 2009 Filing 215 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Wetmore, Michael)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting #212 Motion for leave to file response in excess of page limitations. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 3/5/09. (ASL, )
March 4, 2009 Filing 213 RESPONSE to Motion re #176 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts John Schendel and Harry Ellis, III pursuant to Rule 702 and/or Daubert filed by plas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Dr. John Schendel, Ph.D., #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Harry V. Ellis, III, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 3/4/2009 (ASL, ).
March 4, 2009 Filing 212 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by plas. (Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 3/4/2009 (ASL, ).
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER that plas are awarded total sums set forth in Exhibit A to their statement of costs, that being fees in amount of $19,312.50 and expenses of $627.20; dft and defense counsel are jointly liable for payment of said sums to plas; said amount shall be paid, in full, w/i 10 days of today's date. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 2/27/09. (ASL, )
February 26, 2009 Filing 210 Transcript of Hearing held on 2/19/2009, before Judge Inge P. Johnson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leah S. Turner, Telephone number 205-278-1780. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (#See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 3/19/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/30/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2009. (KSS, )
February 26, 2009 Filing 209 BILL OF COSTS Related to Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions by plas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statements of Time and Expenses)(Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 2/27/2009 (ASL, ).
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER re #201 Motion to compel dft to comply with stipulated protective order, or in the alternative to vacate protective order, and motion for sanctions; pla's motion to compel is GRANTED to extent that Stipulated Protective Order (doc #48 ) is VACATED, said motion is DENIED to extent it sought to have court order dft to comply w/Stipulated Protective Order; parties are allowed 7 days to submit proposed consent protective order; granting #201 plas' motion for sanctions, plas are allowed seven (7) days to submit all costs and fees incurred as set out. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 2/19/09. (ASL, )
February 18, 2009 Filing 207 RESPONSE in Opposition re #201 MOTION to Compel Occidental Chemical Corporation to Comply with Stipulated Protective Order, or in the Alternative to Vacate Protective Order, and Motion for Sanctions filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Janine Hutchison, #2 Exhibit B - 1-18-2008 letter to Bill Curtis, #3 Exhibit C - 2-4-2008 letter to Rhon Jones)(Wetmore, Michael)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER denying #198 plas' motion for sanctions, further ORDERED that dft shall meet and confer "in good faith" pursuant to Rule 37(a)(1), prior to filing of any further motions to compel in the future; denying #194 dft's Motion for Sanctions and/or to compel, without prejudice to dft's right to refile said motion, should same become necessary; parties are reminded that ddls in Scheduling Order of 10/31/07, remain applicable. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 2/17/09. (ASL, )
February 13, 2009 Filing 205 RESPONSE to Motion re #194 MOTION for Sanctions and/or To Compel Supplemental Rule 26 (A) Disclosures from Plaintiffs filed by plas. (Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 2/17/2009 (ASL, ).
February 13, 2009 Filing 204 RESPONSE to re #198 Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition Testimony of Larry Pullen)(Wetmore, Michael)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER denying #197 dft's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Third Party ; granting #200 plas' MOTION to Strike #197 dft's MOTION to Compel; re #201 plas' MOTION to Compel Occidental Chemical Corporation to Comply with Stipulated Protective Order, said motion is set for hearing on 2/19/2009 at 01:30 PM before Judge Inge P Johnson, at said hearing, dft is ORDERED to show court why approximately 800,000 pages of documents produced, as alleged by plas, need to be marked "confidential," as defined by Stipulated Protective Order (doc #48 ). Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 2/9/09. (ASL, )
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER denying #192 MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative Motion to Compel filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation; dft is allowed five (5) days to respond to #198 plas' motion for sanctions. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 2/9/09. (ASL, )
February 9, 2009 Filing 201 MOTION to Compel Occidental Chemical Corporation to Comply with Stipulated Protective Order, or in the Alternative to Vacate Protective Order, and Motion for Sanctions by plas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photographs, #2 Exhibit B - Photographs, #3 Exhibit C - public documents, #4 Exhibit D - public domain documents, #5 Exhibit E - promotional material, #6 Exhibit F - other documents, #7 Exhibit G - 12/1/08 Boutwell letter to Wetmore, #8 Exhibit H - 12/8/08 Wetmore letter to Boutwell, #9 Exhibit I - 12/12/08 Boutwell letter to Wetmore, #10 Exhibit J = 12/16/08 email from Wetmore to Boutwell, #11 Exhibit K - 12/22/08 Boutwell letter to Wetmore, #12 Exhibit L - photographs)(Boutwell, Christopher) Modified on 2/9/2009 (ASL, ).
February 9, 2009 Filing 200 MOTION to Strike #197 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Third Party Martin-Aycock Properties and Plaintiff Harold Eugene ("Gene") Aycock MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Third Party Martin-Aycock Properties and Plaintiff Harold Eugene ("Gene") Aycock MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Third Party Martin-Aycock Properties and Plaintiff Harold Eugene ("Gene") Aycock by plas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Videotaped Deposition)(Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 2/9/2009 (ASL, ).
February 9, 2009 Filing 199 REPLY to Response to Motion re #192 MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative Motion to Compel filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Wetmore, Michael)
February 6, 2009 Filing 198 RESPONSE to Motion re #192 MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative Motion to Compel and Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions filed by plas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 2/9/2009 (ASL, ).
February 6, 2009 Filing 197 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Third Party Martin-Aycock Properties and Plaintiff Harold Eugene ("Gene") Aycock by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1-22-2009 Robertson Email, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition of Gene Aycock, #3 Exhibit C - Deposition of Larry Pullen, #4 Exhibit D - Subpoena, #5 Exhibit E - 1-16-2009 Hutchison Email, #6 Exhibit F - 1-27-2009 Robertson Letter, #7 Exhibit G - 1-29-2009 Buck Letter, #8 Exhibit H - 1-30-2009 Robertson Letter, #9 Exhibit I - Aycock's Amended ROG Responses, #10 Exhibit J - Aycock's RFP Responses, #11 Exhibit K - Aycock's Document Production)(Wetmore, Michael)
February 4, 2009 Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by John E Tomlinson on behalf of all plaintiffs (Tomlinson, John)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER re #194 MOTION for Sanctions and/or To Compel Supplemental Rule 26 (A) Disclosures from Plaintiffs filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation; plas are allowed until 2/13/09 to respond to said motion. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 2/3/09. (ASL, )
February 2, 2009 Filing 194 MOTION for Sanctions and/or To Compel Supplemental Rule 26 (A) Disclosures from Plaintiffs by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wetmore, Michael)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER re #192 MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative Motion to Compel filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation; plas are ORDERED to respond to said motion w/i 14 days. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 1/30/09. (ASL, )
January 29, 2009 Filing 192 MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative Motion to Compel by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Depo Transcript of Gary Ledlow, #2 Exhibit B - Depo Transcript of Charles Jarmon, #3 Exhibit C - Depo Transcript of Willie J. Jones, #4 Exhibit D - Sampling Results Spreadsheet, #5 Exhibit E - Depo Transcript of Carolyn Alford, #6 Exhibit F - Depo Transcript of Craig Jackson)(Wetmore, Michael)
January 23, 2009 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by Chenoa B Vick on behalf of all plaintiffs (Vick, Chenoa)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting #189 Motion to substitute party plaintiff. Gregory D Flint, personal representative for Doris Flint, deceased, added. Doris C Flint terminated. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 1/12/09. (ASL, )
January 12, 2009 Filing 189 MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff by plas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Boutwell, Christopher) Modified on 1/12/2009 (ASL, ).
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting #183 Motion to withdraw attorney Mark Englehart. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 1/8/09. (ASL, )
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER finding as moot #186 Motion to compel discovery and response to dft's motion for protective order. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 1/8/09. (ASL, )
January 7, 2009 Filing 186 MOTION to Compel and Response to Occidental Chemical Corporation's Motion for Protective Order by plas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 1/8/2009 (ASL, ).
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER denying #181 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 1/7/2009. (KSS, )
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting #180 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant's Daubert Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts John Schendel and Harry Ellis, plas' response is due by 3/4/2009. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 1/7/2009. (KSS, )
January 7, 2009 Filing 183 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by plas. (Englehart, Mark) Modified on 1/8/2009 (ASL, ).
January 6, 2009 Filing 182 RESPONSE in Opposition re #180 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jan. 6, 2009 letter from Gil Self)(Wetmore, Michael) Modified on 1/8/2009 (ASL, ).
January 6, 2009 Filing 181 MOTION for Protective Order by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - OCC's Resp. to 1st ROG, #2 Exhibit B - OCC's Supp. Resp. to 1st ROG, #3 Exhibit C - OCC's 2nd Supp. Resp. to 1st ROG, #4 Exhibit D - OCC's Resp. to 2nd ROG, #5 Exhibit E - OCC's Resp. to 3rd ROG, #6 Exhibit F - Robertson's 11-20-2008 Letter, #7 Exhibit G - Schendel's Deposition Testimony, #8 Exhibit H - Wetmore's 12-8-2008 Letter, #9 Exhibit I - Robertson's 12-12-2008 Letter, #10 Exhibit J - Amended Depo Notice - 30(b)(6), #11 Exhibit K - Amended Depo Notice - David Steele)(Wetmore, Michael)
January 6, 2009 Filing 180 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #176 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts John Schendel and Harry Ellis, III pursuant to Rule 702 and/or Daubert by plas. (Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 1/8/2009 (ASL, ).
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting #177 Motion to withdraw Mary Pat O'Connor as counsel of record for plas. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 1/5/09. (ASL, )
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #175 MOTION for leave to file Daubert motion in excess of page limitation filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation; re #176 Daubert MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts John Schendel and Harry Ellis, III filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation, plas are ORDERED to respond to said motion w/i 14 days. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 1/5/09. (ASL, )
December 29, 2008 Filing 177 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by plas. (O'Connor, Mary) Modified on 12/29/2008 (ASL, ).
December 23, 2008 Filing 176 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts John Schendel and Harry Ellis, III pursuant to Rule 702 and/or Daubert by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Ellis Deposition Exhibits), #2 Exhibit B (Schendel Deposition Exhibits), #3 Exhibit C (Ellis Deposition Transcript), #4 Exhibit D (Schendel Deposition Transcript), #5 Exhibit E (12/05/07 email from Farstad to Schendel), #6 Exhibit F (12/31/07 Email from Schendel to Ellis), #7 Exhibit G (01/07/2008 Email from Farstad to Ellis), #8 Exhibit H (Expert Report of William Hall), #9 Exhibit I (Expert Report of Gale Hoffnagle), #10 Exhibit J (Deposition Transcript of Gale Hoffnagle))(Wetmore, Michael)
December 23, 2008 Filing 175 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Daubert motion by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Wetmore, Michael)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #173 Motion to Compel Occidental Chemical Corporation to Permit Plaintiffs' Entry Upon Land and Inspection and Sampling on Property, the dft shall allow the plas' to enter dft's property as set out. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 12/15/2008. (KSS, )
December 12, 2008 Filing 173 MOTION to Compel Occidental Chemical Corporation to Permit Plaintiffs Entry Upon Land and Inspection and Sampling on Property by plas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Errata 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 12/15/2008 (ASL, ).
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #171 Motion to Amend; Order of September 16, 2008 is amended as set out in this order; Clerk is instructed to reinstate plas listed in Exhibit A and terminate plas Marilyn Davis, Mary Andrews, and Barbara Burgess as Administratrix of the Estate of Johnny Burgess (Exhibit A attached). Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 12/5/08. (ASL, )
December 4, 2008 Filing 171 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #165 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by plas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boutwell, Christopher) Modified on 12/4/2008 (ASL, ).
October 21, 2008 Filing 170 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Plaintiff Doris Flint by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Online Obituary for Doris Flint))(Wetmore, Michael)
October 20, 2008 Filing 169 NOTICE of Hearing of Pretrial conference set for 10/29/08 is canceled until June, 2009. (TLM, )
October 17, 2008 Filing 168 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2008 09:00 AM before Judge Inge P Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PRETRIAL INSTRUCTIONS)(TLM, )
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER denying #166 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 9/17/08. (ASL, )
September 16, 2008 Filing 166 MOTION to Compel Answers to Defendant's Third Set of Interrogatories by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Curtis, William)
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part #128 Motion for Summary Judgment as to 100 plas, as set out. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 9/16/08. (ASL, )
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER the status conference previously set is hereby CANCELED, the plas' #149 MOTION for Scheduling Conference is DENIED. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 9/9/2008(KSS, )
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER it is ORDERED that the #161 Motion to Strike is GRANTED as to page 9, lines 3 through 10 of dft's reply, the Motion to Strike is DENIED as to the remainder of said motion. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 9/9/2008. (KSS, )
September 8, 2008 Filing 162 RESPONSE in Opposition re #161 MOTION to Strike #160 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Wetmore, Michael)
September 5, 2008 Filing 161 MOTION to Strike #160 Reply to Response to Motion, by plas. (Boutwell, Christopher) Modified on 9/5/2008 (ASL, ).
September 4, 2008 Filing 160 REPLY to Response to Motion re #128 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to 100 Plaintiffs filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Wetmore, Michael)
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting #156 Motion to Substitute as set out; denying #157 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 9/4/2008. (KSS, )
September 3, 2008 Filing 158 RESPONSE to re #157 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Wetmore, Michael)
September 2, 2008 Filing 157 MOTION to Strike #151 Response to Motion by plas. (Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 9/3/2008 (ASL, ).
September 2, 2008 Filing 156 MOTION to substitute #154 Response in Opposition to Motion, Specifically, Exhibit 5 by plas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, pages 1-46, #2 Exhibit 5, pages 47-93)(Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 9/2/2008 (ASL, ).
August 29, 2008 Filing 155 NOTICE by Plaintiffs of Filing of Letters Testamentary Issued to Ceola Greenhill (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Boutwell, Christopher) Modified on 8/29/2008 (ASL, ).
August 28, 2008 Filing 154 RESPONSE in Opposition re #128 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to 100 Plaintiffs filed by plas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Pages 1-30, #2 Exhibit 1, pages 31-63, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, pages 1-44, #7 Exhibit 5, pages 45-88, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7)(Boutwell, Christopher) Modified on 8/29/2008 (ASL, ).
August 28, 2008 Filing 153 NOTICE by Plaintiffs of Filing of Letters of Administration Issued to Lillie Crawley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Boutwell, Christopher) Modified on 8/28/2008 (ASL, ).
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER scheduling Status Conference for 9/11/2008 at 01:30 PM in Bham AL; Motions terminated: #149 MOTION for Scheduling Conference filed by plas. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 8/27/08. (ASL, )
August 26, 2008 Filing 151 RESPONSE to Motion re #149 MOTION for Scheduling Conference filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Tetra Tech, #2 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Harry Ellis, #3 Exhibit Feb. 7, 2008 notes of John Schendel, #4 Exhibit April 23, 2008 email from Harry Ellis to John Schendel, #5 Exhibit Aprile 29, 2008 email from Harry Ellis to John Schendel, #6 Exhibit Tetra Tech map 1, #7 Exhibit Tetra Tech map 2, #8 Exhibit Schendel chart 1, #9 Exhibit Schendel chart 2, #10 Exhibit Schendel chart 3, #11 Exhibit Schendel note 1, #12 Exhibit Schendel note 2, #13 Exhibit Deposition transcript of John Schendel, #14 Exhibit March 13, 2008 email from Harry Ellis to John Schendel, #15 Exhibit Oct. 2, 2007 hearing transcript, #16 Exhibit Ellis Deposition Exhibit 6, #17 Exhibit City of Muscle Shoals Pollutant Analytical Results, #18 Exhibit Plaintiff George Alexander's interrogatory response, #19 Exhibit Plaintiff Sherry Burt's interrogatory response, #20 Exhibit Plaintiff Barbara Applewhite's interrogatory response, #21 Exhibit Plaintiff John Alexander's interrogatory response)(Wetmore, Michael)
August 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER re #149 MOTION for Scheduling Conference filed by plas; dft is ordered to respond to said motion w/i 7 days. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 8/20/08. (ASL, )
August 19, 2008 Filing 149 MOTION for Scheduling Conference by plas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 8/19/2008 (ASL, ).
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER denying #146 Motion for clarification of court order. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 8/19/08. (ASL, )
August 19, 2008 Filing 147 RESPONSE in Opposition re #146 MOTION to clarify Court Order (doc #144) filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Curtis, William)
August 18, 2008 Filing 146 MOTION to clarify Court Order (doc #144) by plas. (Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 8/19/2008 (ASL, ).
August 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #143 Motion to Substitute Party. Eric Cowley as next friend of Clara Cowley added. Clara B Cowley terminated. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 8/12/08. (ASL, )
August 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #125 Motion to Compel, as to ESI production, plas shall produce such relevant information on or before 8/26/08 and finding that dft's motion to compel signed responses from pla James Harris is MOOT. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 8/12/08. (ASL, )
August 11, 2008 Filing 143 MOTION to Substitute Party by plas. (Boutwell, Christopher) Modified on 8/12/2008 (ASL, ).
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting #138 Motion to file a document under seal. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 8/11/08. (ASL, )
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #135 plas' renewed motion to substitute party plas; granting #136 Motion to substitute. John E Freeman, and Lilly B Crawley, and Ceola Greenhill, and Earline King, and Barbara Burgess added. Josh Freeman; George F Greenhill; Emmitt King, Sr; Johnny R Burgess and Willie James Crawley terminated. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 8/11/08. (ASL, )
August 11, 2008 Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition re #125 MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Electronically Stored Information and Signed Discovery Responses for James Harris filed by plas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Errata 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Boutwell, Christopher) Modified on 8/11/2008 (ASL, ).
August 8, 2008 Filing 138 MOTION to Seal Document by plas. (Boutwell, Christopher) Modified on 8/8/2008 (ASL, ).
August 7, 2008 Filing 137 RESPONSE in Opposition re #136 MOTION to Substitute Party Or, In The Alternative, To Amend Complaint to Add Plaintiffs Earline King and Barbara Burgess, #135 MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Wetmore, Michael)
August 6, 2008 Filing 136 MOTION to Substitute Party Or, In The Alternative, To Amend Complaint to Add Plaintiffs Earline King and Barbara Burgess by Johnny R Burgess, Emmitt King, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Errata 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Robertson, Alyce)
August 6, 2008 Filing 135 MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs by Willie James Crawley, Josh Freeman, George F Greenhill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Boutwell, Christopher)
August 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #120 plas' Motion to Compel, as set out, dft shall furnish said discovery on or before 10 days from entry of this order. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 8/6/08. (ASL, )
August 5, 2008 Filing 133 REPLY to Response to Motion re #120 MOTION to Compel filed by plas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Boutwell, Christopher) Modified on 8/5/2008 (ASL, ).
August 4, 2008 Filing 132 RESPONSE in Opposition re #120 MOTION to Compel filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Curtis, William)
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #130 joint motion for enlargement of time for plas to respond to dft's motion for summary judgment as to 100 plas and for dft to reply to plas' response; plas' response to dft's motion for summary judgment is due on or before 8/28/08 and dft's reply is due w/i seven days after the response is filed. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 8/4/08. (ASL, )
August 4, 2008 Filing 130 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #128 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to 100 Plaintiffs and for Defendant to Reply to Plaintiffs' Response filed by plas and dft . (O'Connor, Mary) Modified on 8/4/2008 (ASL, ).
July 31, 2008 Filing 129 Brief re #128 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to 100 Plaintiffs filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Curtis, William)
July 31, 2008 Filing 128 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to 100 Plaintiffs by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Curtis, William)
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #126 Motion for time to answer dft's motion to compel; plas shall respond to dft's motion to compel (doc #125 ) w/i 14 days from entry of this order. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 7/28/08. (ASL, )
July 23, 2008 Filing 126 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #125 MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Electronically Stored Information and Signed Discovery Responses for James Harris by plas. (Boutwell, Christopher) Modified on 8/5/2008 (ASL, ).
July 22, 2008 Filing 125 MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Electronically Stored Information and Signed Discovery Responses for James Harris by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - May 16, 2008 Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - May 23, 2008 Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - May 28, 2008 Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - May 30, 2008 Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - June 3, 2008 Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - June 3, 2008 Letter, #7 Exhibit 7 - June 10, 2008 Letter, #8 Exhibit 8 - June 13, 2008 Letter, #9 Exhibit 9 - June 24, 2008 Letter, #10 Exhibit 10 - July 11, 2008 Letter, #11 Exhibit 11 - July 17, 2008 E-mail, #12 Exhibit 12 - Interrogatory Responses by James Harris, #13 Exhibit 13 - Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by James Harris)(Curtis, William)
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying #118 Motion to Substitute Party as set out.. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 7/22/2008. (KSS, )
July 22, 2008 Filing 123 REPLY to Response to Motion re #118 MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs' Motion to Substitute Eric Cowley As Next Friend of Clara Cowley filed by Clara B Cowley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Robertson, Alyce)
July 21, 2008 Filing 122 RESPONSE in Opposition re #118 MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs' Motion to Substitute Eric Cowley As Next Friend of Clara Cowley filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email dated 7-14-2008, #2 Exhibit B - Email dated 7-17-2008)(Curtis, William)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER re #120 MOTION to Compel, it is ORDERED by the court that dft is allowed 14 days from today's date to respond to motion. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 7/21/2008. (KSS, )
July 18, 2008 Filing 120 MOTION to Compel by plas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6(a), #7 Exhibit 6(b), #8 Exhibit 6(c), #9 Exhibit 6(d), #10 Exhibit 6(e), #11 Exhibit 6(f), #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11)(Boutwell, Christopher) Modified on 7/21/2008 (ASL, ).
July 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER re #118 Plaintiffs' Motion to Substitute Eric Cowley As Next Friend of Clara Cowley; dft is allowed 14 days to respond to said motion. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 7/7/08. (ASL, )
July 3, 2008 Filing 118 MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs' Motion to Substitute Eric Cowley As Next Friend of Clara Cowley by plas. (Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 7/7/2008 (ASL, ).
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #115 Motion to Dismiss Party Plaintiffs, it is ORDERED that the claims of plas Johnny Cowan, Odessa Eggleston, Percy Eggleston, Marvie Goodloe, Kent King, Esther McAfee, Sabrina Mitchell, Otis Neloms, Mary Ricks, Rosa Smith, Claude B. Vernon, Jr., and Katrina Little against dft are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 6/30/2008. (KSS, )
June 30, 2008 Filing 116 RESPONSE to Motion re #115 MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiffs with Prejudice filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Wetmore, Michael)
June 27, 2008 Filing 115 MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiffs by Johnny M Cowan, Odessa Eggleston, Percy Eggleston, Marvin R Goodloe, Kent King, Katrina Little, Ester McAfee, Sabrina Mitchell, Otis Neloms, Mary H Ricks, Rosa Smith, Claude B Vernon, Jr. (Boutwell, Christopher)
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #104 Motion to clarify Order regarding preservation of evidence, as set out in this order. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 5/27/08. (ASL, )
May 22, 2008 Filing 113 REPLY to re #104 Motion to Amend and/or Clarify Order Regarding Preservation of Evidence filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Photos)(Wetmore, Michael)
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #101 amended motion to substitute party plas; DENIED as to Earline King, Barbara Burgess, John Freeman, Reva Vernon, Lilly Crawley and Creola Greenhill and GRANTED as to Frankie Fitzgerald Hogan as Executrix of the Estate of Willie Fitzgerald for named pla Willie Fitzgerald, subject to said Executrix providing to dft letters of administration for this estate. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 5/21/08. (ASL, )
May 21, 2008 Filing 111 REPLY to Response to Motion re #101 Amended MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs filed by Johnny R Burgess, Willie James Crawley, Willie L Fitzgerald, Josh Freeman, George F Greenhill, Emmitt King, Sr, Claude B Vernon, Jr. (Boutwell, Christopher)
May 21, 2008 Filing 110 RESPONSE to Motion re #104 MOTION to clarify Order Regarding Preservation of Evidence filed by plas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 5/22/2008 (ASL, ).
May 20, 2008 Filing 109 Opposition to re #101 Plaintiffs' Amended Motion to Substitute Party Plaintiffs filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Errata 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41)(Wetmore, Michael)
May 14, 2008 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D Boutwell on behalf of all plaintiffs (Boutwell, Christopher)
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER re #105 Response to court order for clarification of damages filed by plas; dft is allowed until 5/20/08 to respond to said motion. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 5/14/08. (ASL, )
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER re #104 MOTION to clarify Order Regarding Preservation of Evidence filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation; plas are allowed until 5/21/08 to respond to said motion. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 5/13/08. (ASL, )
May 13, 2008 Filing 105 RESPONSE to re #103 Court Order for Clarification of Damages for Deceased Plaintiffs filed by Johnny R Burgess, Willie James Crawley, Willie L Fitzgerald, Josh Freeman, George F Greenhill, Emmitt King, Sr, Claude B Vernon, Jr. (Robertson, Alyce)
May 13, 2008 Filing 104 MOTION to clarify Order Regarding Preservation of Evidence by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Wetmore, Michael)
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #102 Motion to substitute and/or dismiss and amend the complaint to replace named party pla Charles Andrews with Mary Andrews. Mary Andrews rep by Jere L Beasley, Mary Pat O'Connor, Rhon E Jones, Alyce Street Robertson, Mark Englehart, R Leland Lesley added. Charles Andrews terminated; court withholds ruling on #101 pending motion to substitute party plas pending clarification as set out in this order. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 5/9/08. (ASL, )
May 8, 2008 Filing 102 MOTION to Substitute Party and/or Dismiss and Amend the Complaint to Replace Named Party Plaintiff Charles Andrews with Mary Andrews by Charles Andrews. (Robertson, Alyce)
May 8, 2008 Filing 101 Amended MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs by Johnny R Burgess, Willie James Crawley, Willie L Fitzgerald, Josh Freeman, George F Greenhill, Emmitt King, Sr, Claude B Vernon, Jr. (Robertson, Alyce)
May 8, 2008 Filing 100 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Emmitt King, Sr., Johnny Burgess, Josh Freeman, Claude Vernon, Jr., Willie Crawley, George Greenhill, and Willie Fitzgerald by Johnny R Burgess, Willie James Crawley, Willie L Fitzgerald, Josh Freeman, George F Greenhill, Emmitt King, Sr, Claude B Vernon, Jr. (Robertson, Alyce)
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #98 Motion for enlargement of time to supplement their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures; plas have an add'l 15 days to supplement initial disclosures for these two plas. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 5/5/08. (ASL, )
May 2, 2008 Filing 98 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Supplement Their Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Clara B Cowley, Otis Neloms. (O'Connor, Mary)
May 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #93 Motion to substitute and dismiss party plas; all claims of plas George Felton, Margaret Smith, Hollis Isbell, Tom Haney, Jo C. Montgomery, Alonzo Thompson, Sheryle Bracy, Charles Carter, and Darlene Goodloe against dft are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; said motion is DENIED without prejudice to plas' right to properly and timely file suggestions of death for plas in question.. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 5/2/08. (ASL, )
May 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying #94 Motion for enlargement of time to supplement their Rule 26(a)(1) intitial disclosures. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 5/2/08. (ASL, )
May 1, 2008 Filing 95 RESPONSE in Opposition re #93 MOTION to Substitute Party and Dismiss Party Plaintiffs filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Wetmore, Michael)
April 30, 2008 Filing 94 MOTION for Extension of Time to Supplement Their Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Clara B Cowley, Otis Neloms. (Robertson, Alyce)
April 30, 2008 Filing 93 MOTION to Substitute Party and Dismiss Party Plaintiffs by Charles Andrews, Sheryle Y Bracy, Johnny R Burgess, Charles L Carter, Willie James Crawley, George W Felton, Willie L Fitzgerald, Josh Freeman, Darlene Goodloe, George F Greenhill, Thomas L Haney, Hollis Isbell, Emmitt King, Sr, Jo C Montgomery, Margaret Smith, Alonzo Thompson, Claude B Vernon, Jr. (Robertson, Alyce)
April 25, 2008 Filing 92 NOTICE by Occidental Chemical Corporation of Change of Firm Name and Email Addresses (Curtis, William)
April 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting in part, denying in part and finding as moot in part #81 motion to compel and #86 second motion to compel. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 4/15/08. (ASL, )
April 11, 2008 Filing 90 Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation's Addendum to Joint Report of the Parties filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Wetmore, Michael) Modified on 4/14/2008 (ASL, ).
April 11, 2008 Filing 89 Joint Report of the Parties per Order filed 3/4/2008 (Court Doc. #84) filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Wetmore, Michael) Modified on 4/14/2008 (ASL, ).
April 9, 2008 Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re #86 Second MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs To Supplement Discovery Responses filed by plas. (Jones, Rhon) Modified on 4/9/2008 (ASL, ).
April 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re #86 MOTION to Compel filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation; plas are ordered to respond to said motion to compel w/i 5 days. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 4/7/08. (ASL, )
April 4, 2008 Filing 86 Second MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs To Supplement Discovery Responses by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M#14 Exhibit N#15 Exhibit O)(Curtis, William)
March 27, 2008 Filing 85 NOTICE of Hearing: Docket Call set for 4/17/2008 09:00 AM before Judge Inge P Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit motion docket instructions)(TLM, )
March 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re #81 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Supplement Rule 26(A) Disclosures and Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Admission filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation; dft's motion is set for hearing on court's motion docket of 4/17/2008 09:00 AM in Bham AL; prior to said date and time, parties are ORDERED to meet in good faith and attempt to resolve their latest dispute as set out. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 3/4/08. (ASL, )
February 21, 2008 Filing 83 RESPONSE to Motion re #81 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Supplement Rule 26(A) Disclosures and Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Admission MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Supplement Rule 26(A) Disclosures and Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Admission MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Supplement Rule 26(A) Disclosures and Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Admission MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Supplement Rule 26(A) Disclosures and Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Admission filed by plas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)(Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 2/21/2008 (ASL, ).
February 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER re #81 MOTION to Compel filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation; plas are ordered to respond to said motion w/i 10 days. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 2/11/08. (ASL, )
February 8, 2008 Filing 81 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Supplement Rule 26(A) Disclosures and Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - August 17, 2007 letter from Plaintiffs#2 Exhibit B - Example Interrogatories directed to Plaintiffs#3 Exhibit C - Example Response from Plaintiffs to Defendant's Interrogatories#4 Exhibit D - Example Request for Admissions directed to Plaintiffs#5 Exhibit E - Example Response from Plaintiffs to Defendant's Request for Admissions#6 Exhibit F - Plaintiffs' Rule 26 Disclosures#7 Exhibit G - December 20, 2007 from Defendant#8 Exhibit H - January 11, 2008 letter from Plaintiffs#9 Exhibit I - January 23, 2008 letter from Defendant)(Wetmore, Michael) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2008 (ASL, ).
January 3, 2008 Filing 80 NOTICE by Occidental Chemical Corporation re #74 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) of Filing Related Court Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Oceana's Opposition to Occidental's Motion to Compel and Cross Motion for Protective Order#2 Exhibit 2 - Occidental's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel#3 Exhibit 3 - Oceana's Sur-Reply#4 Exhibit 4 - Minute Entry by the Honorable Judge James Robertson granting Occidental's Motion to Compel)(Curtis, William)
December 17, 2007 Filing 79 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report for ESI Search Protocol by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Curtis, William)
December 7, 2007 Filing 78 RESPONSE to re #77 Court Order filed by plas. (Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 12/17/2007 (ASL, ).
December 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #75 Motion for miscellaneous relief based on plas' failure to comply with order regarding search protocol for electronically stored information, as set out in this order. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 12/4/07. (ASL, )
December 3, 2007 Filing 76 RESPONSE to Motion re #75 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief Based on Plaintiffs' Failure to Comply with Prior Order Regarding Search Protocol for Electronically Stored Information filed by plas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Errata 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6)(Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 12/4/2007 (ASL, ).
November 30, 2007 Filing 75 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief Based on Plaintiffs' Failure to Comply with Prior Order Regarding Search Protocol for Electronically Stored Information by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Search Strings#2 Exhibit B - Letter dated 9-24-2007#3 Exhibit C - Letter dated 6-28-2007#4 Exhibit D - Letter dated 7-19-2007#5 Exhibit E - Letter dated 7-30-2007#6 Exhibit F - Letter dated 9-24-2007#7 Exhibit G - Letter dated 9-27-2007#8 Exhibit H - Letter dated 11-12-2007)(Curtis, William)
November 26, 2007 Filing 74 NOTICE by Occidental Chemical Corporation of Filing Related Court Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendant's Motion to Compel Non-Party Oceana, Inc. to Comply with Subpoena#2 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint#3 Exhibit B - Oceana Advertisement#4 Exhibit C - TimesDaily Article#5 Exhibit D - Oceana's July 2007 Report#6 Exhibit E - Subpoena#7 Exhibit F - Proof of Service#8 Exhibit G - Oceana Letter#9 Exhibit H - Letter to Bilsky#10 Exhibit I - Letter to Curtis#11 Exhibit J - Letter to Glover#12 Exhibit K - Letter to Curtis)(Curtis, William)
October 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 73 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 10/31/07. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summary Judgment Scheduling ORDER)(ASL, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Motion to Withdraw David B. Byrne, III as Attorney for plas. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 10/17/07. (ASL, )
October 15, 2007 Filing 71 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiffs by David B. Byrne, III, (Byrne, David) Modified on 10/15/2007 (ASL, ).
October 1, 2007 Filing 70 MOTION to Enter Plaintiffs' Case Management Order by plas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 10/2/2007 (ASL, ).
September 28, 2007 Filing 69 NOTICE by Occidental Chemical Corporation of Service of Defendant's First Request for Admissions Directed to Plaintiffs (Curtis, William)
September 28, 2007 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Pat O'Connor on behalf of Willie Jones, George Alexander, Jr, John D Alexander, Carolyn Alford, Cynthia Y Allen, Herchial Allen, Charles L Anderson, Charles Andrews, Barbara Applewhite, Gene Aycock, Audrey Bailey, Hirman C Bailey, Martin Bailey, Jr, Ruthie A Bailey, Robert E Barber, Grace M Bates, Sharon A Baugh, James H Bean, Ronald R Bowling, Sheryle Y Bracy, Jimmy R Bradford, Bonnie L Burgess, Jr, Bonnie Lee Burgess, Sr, Charlie R Burgess, Johnny R Burgess, Larry Sr Burgess, Perry C Burgess, Shirley A Burgess, Thomas L Burgess, Deloris A Burt, Jenett Burt, Jennie Burt, Melvin L Burt, Sr, Sherry C Burt, Shirley Burt, Thomas H Burt, Delois Cal, Charley F Campbell, Linda Caperton, Charles L Carter, Nena K Chapman, Swanzetta Cheatom, Brenda D Cobb, Charles L Cobb, James E Cole, Sandra Cooper, Johnny M Cowan, Clara B Cowley, Curtis Crawley, Marion Crawley, Willie James Crawley, Nazarene T Darrough, Fred Darthard, Sr, Joyce W Davis, Marilyn G Davis, Walter J Davis, Edward B Dixon, Reja O Doss, Mildred E Eggleston, Odessa Eggleston, Percy Eggleston, George W Felton, Myrtle L Fields, Fachia Files, First Baptist Church of Shoals City, Willie L Fitzgerald, Doris C Flint, Billy H Ford, Betty Fort, Concettia H Fort, Lillie M Fort, Willie J Fort, Josh Freeman, Katie R Freeman, Terrence Freeman, David Fuqua, Leo Fuqua, Willie L Fuqua, Paul Gholston, Rosie Gholston, Walter L Gholston, Elizabeth I Goode, Glenda F Goode, Darlene Goodloe, Marvin R Goodloe, Yolanda Goodloe, Brenda E Goodwin, George Granville, George F Greenhill, Edna Hamilton, Alma Hampton, Thomas L Hampton, Virginia Hampton, Walter Hampton, Thomas L Haney, Mary L Harris, Russell Harris, John L Hayes, Romelia C Hogan, Leo Hollingsworth, Sr, Gwendolyn Hood, Ester Horrison, Doris L Howard, Lydia F Howard, Leotha Ingram, Jr, Hollis Isbell, Craig Jackson, James L Jackson, Jerita Jackson, Walter Jackson, Jr, Albert L Jarmon, Charles Jarmon, Janice Jarmon, Sabrina Jarmon, Veronica Jarmon, Barbara Johnson, Governor O Johnson, Jr, Irene Johnson, Linda M Johnson, Willie Johnson, Jr, Gary D Jones, John Jones, Jr, Rosie L Jones, Ruby E Jones, Ruby Elaine Jones, Willie B Jones, Percy L Kimbrough, David King, Devon King, Emmitt King, Jr, Emmitt King, Sr, Glenda W King, Janice H King, Kent King, Willie H King, Doris Knox, Michael W Landers, Gary L Ledlow, Carol A Lesley, Dean Lesley, Dickey G Lesley, William R Lewis, Kenny D Liles, Rhonda Lindsey, Jessie J Little, Joseph Little, Sr, Katrina Little, Mark Little, Willie J Little, Sr, Henry M Long, Sherry Long, Lillian T Mars, Lorene Martin, Marion L Martin, Mary G Mastin, Andrew J Mayes, John R Mayes, Mildred Mayes, Ester McAfee, Elizabeth McDaniel, Charlie McDuffle, Jr, Emma McGaha, Margaret McNeece, Edna T McPherson, Michael Meade, Shirley Meadows, Sadell Meredith, Weston C Metcalf, Marion D Mims, Sabrina Mitchell, Sarah W Mitchell, Wanda R Mitchell, Jo C Montgomery, Ella Moss, Gail W Mullens, Isaiah Neloms, Jr, Isaiah Neloms, III, Otis Neloms, Percy L Neloms, Simon Neloms, William M Neloms, Clyde W Newsome, Robert Newsome, Jr, Towanda Nixon, Gloria Oliver, Marie Owen, Andrew Pearsall, Mattie Penn, Natalie B Peters, Dorothy L Phillips, Riverside Texaco, Edward W Phillips, Scott G Phillips, Willie Phillips, Zela M Phillips, Robert Poellnitz, Patricia Pounders, Howard Pratt, Bobby A Pruitt, Edgar E Pruitt, Karel Pruitt, Shelia Pullen, Mariko Redcross, Riley D Reels, Mary H Ricks, Richard Ricks, William D Ricks, Beverly Ross, Judge D Royal, Mattie Russell, Queen E Rutland, Ollie Sanders, Jr, Virginia K Sanders, Lugertha Sharpley, Bessie Smith, Dora B Smith, Horace J Smith, Larry D Smith, Margaret Smith, Rosa Smith, Vinson T Smith, William M Smith, Robert E Speegle, Richard C Stanley, Kenneth Stowe, Lucille B Suttle, Patricia G Terry, Lucille P Thomas, Alonzo Thompson, Aneitha Thompson, Annie P Thompson, Cecelia Thompson, Claiborn B Thompson, Leatha A Thompson, Robert E Thompson, Tammie Tidwell, Dayle A Turner, Nazery B Turner, Claude B Vernon, Jr, Charles E Vess, Donna Vinson, Greg Vinson, Nellie P Vinson, Hilda B Warren, Mildred W Warren, Minnie L Warren, Frank Watson, David Watts, Dexter B Watts, Oscar O Watts, Jr, Oscar O Watts, III, Michael Weakley, Ollie Weaver, Rosie L West, Patsy White, Annie R Whiteside, Carol A Whiteside, Eddie Whiteside, James Whiteside, Jr, Terilyn Whiteside, John A Williams, Lula M Williams, Ruthie P Williams, Riley L Young, Carlos G McMullins, Hazel I Cox, James R Harris, Walter J Jackson, Gladys Pullen (O'Connor, Mary)
September 28, 2007 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Englehart on behalf of Willie Jones, George Alexander, Jr, John D Alexander, Carolyn Alford, Cynthia Y Allen, Herchial Allen, Charles L Anderson, Charles Andrews, Barbara Applewhite, Gene Aycock, Audrey Bailey, Hirman C Bailey, Martin Bailey, Jr, Ruthie A Bailey, Robert E Barber, Grace M Bates, Sharon A Baugh, James H Bean, Ronald R Bowling, Sheryle Y Bracy, Jimmy R Bradford, Bonnie L Burgess, Jr, Bonnie Lee Burgess, Sr, Charlie R Burgess, Johnny R Burgess, Larry Sr Burgess, Perry C Burgess, Shirley A Burgess, Thomas L Burgess, Deloris A Burt, Jenett Burt, Jennie Burt, Melvin L Burt, Sr, Sherry C Burt, Shirley Burt, Thomas H Burt, Delois Cal, Charley F Campbell, Linda Caperton, Charles L Carter, Nena K Chapman, Swanzetta Cheatom, Brenda D Cobb, Charles L Cobb, James E Cole, Sandra Cooper, Johnny M Cowan, Clara B Cowley, Curtis Crawley, Marion Crawley, Willie James Crawley, Nazarene T Darrough, Fred Darthard, Sr, Joyce W Davis, Marilyn G Davis, Walter J Davis, Edward B Dixon, Reja O Doss, Mildred E Eggleston, Odessa Eggleston, Percy Eggleston, George W Felton, Myrtle L Fields, Fachia Files, First Baptist Church of Shoals City, Willie L Fitzgerald, Doris C Flint, Billy H Ford, Betty Fort, Concettia H Fort, Lillie M Fort, Willie J Fort, Josh Freeman, Katie R Freeman, Terrence Freeman, David Fuqua, Leo Fuqua, Willie L Fuqua, Paul Gholston, Rosie Gholston, Walter L Gholston, Elizabeth I Goode, Glenda F Goode, Darlene Goodloe, Marvin R Goodloe, Yolanda Goodloe, Brenda E Goodwin, George Granville, George F Greenhill, Edna Hamilton, Alma Hampton, Thomas L Hampton, Virginia Hampton, Walter Hampton, Thomas L Haney, Mary L Harris, Russell Harris, John L Hayes, Romelia C Hogan, Leo Hollingsworth, Sr, Gwendolyn Hood, Ester Horrison, Doris L Howard, Lydia F Howard, Leotha Ingram, Jr, Hollis Isbell, Craig Jackson, James L Jackson, Jerita Jackson, Walter Jackson, Jr, Albert L Jarmon, Charles Jarmon, Janice Jarmon, Sabrina Jarmon, Veronica Jarmon, Barbara Johnson, Governor O Johnson, Jr, Irene Johnson, Linda M Johnson, Willie Johnson, Jr, Gary D Jones, John Jones, Jr, Rosie L Jones, Ruby E Jones, Ruby Elaine Jones, Willie B Jones, Percy L Kimbrough, David King, Devon King, Emmitt King, Jr, Emmitt King, Sr, Glenda W King, Janice H King, Kent King, Willie H King, Doris Knox, Michael W Landers, Gary L Ledlow, Carol A Lesley, Dean Lesley, Dickey G Lesley, William R Lewis, Kenny D Liles, Rhonda Lindsey, Jessie J Little, Joseph Little, Sr, Katrina Little, Mark Little, Willie J Little, Sr, Henry M Long, Sherry Long, Lillian T Mars, Lorene Martin, Marion L Martin, Mary G Mastin, Andrew J Mayes, John R Mayes, Mildred Mayes, Ester McAfee, Elizabeth McDaniel, Charlie McDuffle, Jr, Emma McGaha, Margaret McNeece, Edna T McPherson, Michael Meade, Shirley Meadows, Sadell Meredith, Weston C Metcalf, Marion D Mims, Sabrina Mitchell, Sarah W Mitchell, Wanda R Mitchell, Jo C Montgomery, Ella Moss, Gail W Mullens, Isaiah Neloms, Jr, Isaiah Neloms, III, Otis Neloms, Percy L Neloms, Simon Neloms, William M Neloms, Clyde W Newsome, Robert Newsome, Jr, Towanda Nixon, Gloria Oliver, Marie Owen, Andrew Pearsall, Mattie Penn, Natalie B Peters, Dorothy L Phillips, Riverside Texaco, Edward W Phillips, Scott G Phillips, Willie Phillips, Zela M Phillips, Robert Poellnitz, Patricia Pounders, Howard Pratt, Bobby A Pruitt, Edgar E Pruitt, Karel Pruitt, Shelia Pullen, Mariko Redcross, Riley D Reels, Mary H Ricks, Richard Ricks, William D Ricks, Beverly Ross, Judge D Royal, Mattie Russell, Queen E Rutland, Ollie Sanders, Jr, Virginia K Sanders, Lugertha Sharpley, Bessie Smith, Dora B Smith, Horace J Smith, Larry D Smith, Margaret Smith, Rosa Smith, Vinson T Smith, William M Smith, Robert E Speegle, Richard C Stanley, Kenneth Stowe, Lucille B Suttle, Patricia G Terry, Lucille P Thomas, Alonzo Thompson, Aneitha Thompson, Annie P Thompson, Cecelia Thompson, Claiborn B Thompson, Leatha A Thompson, Robert E Thompson, Tammie Tidwell, Dayle A Turner, Nazery B Turner, Claude B Vernon, Jr, Charles E Vess, Donna Vinson, Greg Vinson, Nellie P Vinson, Hilda B Warren, Mildred W Warren, Minnie L Warren, Frank Watson, David Watts, Dexter B Watts, Oscar O Watts, Jr, Oscar O Watts, III, Michael Weakley, Ollie Weaver, Rosie L West, Patsy White, Annie R Whiteside, Carol A Whiteside, Eddie Whiteside, James Whiteside, Jr, Terilyn Whiteside, John A Williams, Lula M Williams, Ruthie P Williams, Riley L Young, Carlos G McMullins, Hazel I Cox, James R Harris, Walter J Jackson, Gladys Pullen (Englehart, Mark)
September 21, 2007 Filing 66 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Case Management Order by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Curtis, William)
September 21, 2007 Filing 65 MOTION to Amend/Correct and Enter Defendant's Case Management Order by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Curtis, William)
September 19, 2007 Filing 64 Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Occidental Chemical Corporation.(Curtis, William)
September 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER pursuant to conference call, scheduling conference set for 9/13/07 is CANCELED; parties are ordered to submit proposed scheduling order in word perfect format to chambers e-mail on or before 9/21/07, if any aspects of scheduling order remain unresolved, they will be considered at a hearing on 10/2/2007 at 12:00 PM. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 9/12/07. (ASL, )
September 8, 2007 Filing 62 NOTICE by Occidental Chemical Corporation of Service of Discovery Documents (Curtis, William)
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #60 MOTION for a Scheduling Conference filed by plas. Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2007 11:00 AM before Judge Inge P Johnson. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 9/7/07. (ASL, )
September 6, 2007 Filing 60 Plaintiffs' Motion For A Scheduling Conference (Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 9/6/2007 (ASL, ).
September 5, 2007 Filing 59 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) against Occidental Chemical Corporation, filed by Willie Jones, Riverside Texaco, Carlos G McMullins, Hazel I Cox, James R Harris, Walter J Jackson, Gladys Pullen.(Robertson, Alyce)
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER that plas refile second amended complaint depicting style of case in accordance with Rule 10(a) of the FRCP. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 9/5/07. (ASL, )
September 4, 2007 Filing 57 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) against Occidental Chemical Corporation, filed by Willie Jones, Riverside Texaco, Carlos G McMullins, Hazel I Cox, James R Harris, Walter J Jackson, Gladys Pullen.(Robertson, Alyce)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #52 Motion to amend complaint to voluntarily dismiss class allegations without prejudice and to proceed with individual claims; granting #53 Motion to amend complaint to dismiss individual party dfts and to add party plas; plas shall e-file amended complaint separately forthwith. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 9/4/07. (ASL, )
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Motion to substitute to correct clerical error. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 9/4/07. (ASL, )
August 31, 2007 Filing 54 MOTION to Amend/Correct Clerical Error by Willie Jones, Riverside Texaco, Carlos G McMullins, Hazel I Cox, James R Harris, Walter J Jackson, Gladys Pullen. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint)(Robertson, Alyce)
August 31, 2007 Filing 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct complaint to voluntarily dismiss class allegations without prejudice and to proceed with individual claims by Willie Jones, Riverside Texaco, Carlos G McMullins, Hazel I Cox, James R Harris, Walter J Jackson, Gladys Pullen. (Robertson, Alyce) Modified on 8/31/2007 - deemed filed 8/30/07 - document originally filed incorrect (ASL, ).
August 31, 2007 Filing 52 MOTION to Amend/Correct to dismiss individual party defendants and to add party plaintiffs by Willie Jones, Riverside Texaco, Carlos G McMullins, Hazel I Cox, James R Harris, Walter J Jackson, Gladys Pullen. (Robertson, Alyce) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2007 (ASL, ). Modified on 8/31/2007 - deemed filed 8/30/07 - document orginally filed incorrect (ASL, ).
August 24, 2007 Filing 51 NOTICE by Occidental Chemical Corporation of Sevice of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Curtis, William)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 joint motion for enlargement of time to amend pleadings and join additional parties, parties are allowed until 8/30/07 to amend pleadings and join additional parties . Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 8/17/07. (ASL, )
August 16, 2007 Filing 49 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #46 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend, Pleadings and Joint Additional Parties by Willie Jones, Occidental Chemical Corporation, David Ryskoski, Anita Mitchell, Riverside Texaco, Carlos G McMullins, Hazel I Cox, James R Harris, Walter J Jackson, Gladys Pullen. (Robertson, Alyce)
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #47 Motion for Protective Order regarding disclosure of confidential material as set out in this order. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 8/15/07. (ASL, )
August 14, 2007 Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Willie Jones, Occidental Chemical Corporation, David Ryskoski, Anita Mitchell, Riverside Texaco, Carlos G McMullins, Hazel I Cox, James R Harris, Walter J Jackson, Gladys Pullen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order)(Robertson, Alyce)
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 joint motion for enlargement of time to amend pleadings and join additional parties; deadline for amending the pleadings and/or joining additional parties is extended until 8/16/07 . Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 8/2/07. (ASL, )
August 2, 2007 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings and Join Additional Parties by Willie Jones, Occidental Chemical Corporation, David Ryskoski, Anita Mitchell, Riverside Texaco, Carlos G McMullins, Hazel I Cox, James R Harris, Walter J Jackson, Gladys Pullen. (Robertson, Alyce)
July 5, 2007 Filing 44 NOTICE by Occidental Chemical Corporation of Service of Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff Riverside Texaco (Curtis, William)
July 5, 2007 Filing 43 NOTICE by Occidental Chemical Corporation of Service of Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiffs Hazel I. Cox, James R. Harris, Walter J. Jackson, Willie Jones, Gladys Pullen, and Carlos G. McMullins (Curtis, William)
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REGARDING SEARCH PROTOCOL AND PRODUCTION FORMAT FOR ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION by agreement of the parties, as set out. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 6/6/07. (ASL, )
May 31, 2007 Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT of hearing proceedings held on 4/26/07 before Judge Inge P. Johnson. Court Reporter: Leah S. Turner. [Contact court reporter for copy of transcript] (ASL, )
May 30, 2007 Filing 40 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Occidental Chemical Corporation, Anita Mitchell, David Ryskoski.(Curtis, William) Modified on 5/31/2007 (ASL, ).
May 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER pursuant to a request made by conference call, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties have until 6/5/2007 to submit their proposed order regarding search protocol and production format for electronically stored information. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 5/24/2007. (KSS, )
May 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to File Answer Out of Time, dfts shall file their answer on or before 5/30/2007 . Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 5/21/2007. (KSS, )
May 18, 2007 Filing 37 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out Of Time by Occidental Chemical Corporation, David Ryskoski, Anita Mitchell. (Curtis, William)
May 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SCHEDULING ORDER Discovery due by 7/25/2008. Dispositive Motions due by 8/8/2008. Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2008 in Florence, AL. Jury Trial set for 11/17/2008 09:00 AM before Judge Inge P Johnson in Florence, AL and other time limits as set out in this order. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 5/15/07. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summary Judgment Scheduling ORDER)(ASL, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2007 (ASL, ).
May 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 joint motion for enlargement of time to submit proposed order regarding ESI search protocol and production format; parties have until 5/24/07 . Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 5/14/07. (ASL, )
May 14, 2007 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Order Regarding ESI Search Protocol and Production Format by Willie Jones, Riverside Texaco, Carlos G McMullins, Hazel I Cox, James R Harris, Walter J Jackson, Gladys Pullen. (Robertson, Alyce)
May 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REGARDING PRESERVATION OF EVIDENCE-parties ORDERED to meet and confer to develop a list of key Occidental employee custodians for whom Occidental will be required to forensically image the company-owned computers to preserve the active and residual ESI; further ORDERED that parties shall have the right to seek modification of this order if it should appear its implementation shall become unduly burdensome for them;parties ORDERED to submit a proposed order regarding the search protocol and production format for electronically stored information at the same time they submit an agreed scheduling order. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 5/7/07. (MAA, )
April 27, 2007 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 200 235892 for Arthur Smith (ASL, )
April 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying #16 Motion to Dismiss first amended complaint; granting motion to dismiss plas' fraud claim, plas' fraud claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; parties shall submit proposed scheduling order on or before 5/14/07. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 4/26/07. (ASL, )
April 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for attorney Arthur L. Smith to be admitted pro hac vice; subject to payment of the fee. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 4/24/07. (ASL, )
April 24, 2007 Filing 30 MOTION for Limited Admission for Arthur L. Smith by Occidental Chemical Corporation, David Ryskoski, Anita Mitchell. (Alston, Michael)
April 20, 2007 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by R Leland Lesley on behalf of Willie Jones, Riverside Texaco, Carlos G McMullins, Hazel I Cox, James R Harris, Walter J Jackson, Gladys Pullen (Lesley, R)
April 19, 2007 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by William J Curtis on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation, David Ryskoski, Anita Mitchell (Curtis, William)
April 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #25 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting; scheduling conference will be held immediately after hearing scheduled for 4/26/07 in Florence, AL; parties are further ordered to be prepared to discuss mediation. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 4/16/07. (ASL, )
April 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation, David Ryskoski, Anita Mitchell; said motion to dismiss will be heard on 4/26/2007 at 09:00 AM before Judge Inge P Johnson in Florence, AL. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 4/10/07. (ASL, )
April 9, 2007 Filing 25 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Robertson, Alyce)
April 9, 2007 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by David B Byrne, III on behalf of Willie Jones, Riverside Texaco, Carlos G McMullins, Hazel I Cox, James R Harris, Walter J Jackson, Gladys Pullen (Byrne, David)
April 6, 2007 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation, David Ryskoski, Anita Mitchell. (Curtis, William)
March 27, 2007 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to dft David Ryskoski (ASL, )
March 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER it is ORDERED by the court that the dfts are allowed until 4/6/2007, to reply to the plas' response to the dfts' motion to dismiss . Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 3/27/2007. (KSS, )
March 26, 2007 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Willie Jones, Riverside Texaco, Carlos G McMullins, Hazel I Cox, James R Harris, Walter J Jackson, Gladys Pullen. (Robertson, Alyce)
March 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs respond to said motion within 14 days from the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 3/12/2007. (KSS, )
March 12, 2007 Filing 18 Summons and amended complaint issued as to David Ryskoski, mailed certified mail (ASL, )
March 9, 2007 Filing 17 Brief re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation, David Ryskoski, Anita Mitchell. (Curtis, William)
March 9, 2007 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Occidental Chemical Corporation, David Ryskoski, Anita Mitchell. (Curtis, William)
March 5, 2007 Filing 15 Request for service by certified mail filed by Willie Jones, Riverside Texaco, Carlos G McMullins, Hazel I Cox, James R Harris, Walter J Jackson, Gladys Pullen. (Robertson, Alyce)
February 26, 2007 PHV Fee paid: $ 200.00, receipt number 200 234083 (ASL, )
February 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for attys Michael H. Wetmore, William J. Curtis, Robyn D. Buck, and John K. Power to appear pro hac vice; subject to payment of the fees. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 2/22/07. (ASL, )
February 21, 2007 Filing 13 MOTION for Limited Admission Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Occidental Chemical Corporation, David Ryskoski, Anita Mitchell. (Alston, Michael)
February 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that hearing previously set for February 27, 2007, is CANCELED. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 2/15/07. (ASL, )
February 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING TRIAL Pretrial Conference set for 9/24/2007 in Bham AL. Jury Trial set for 10/15/2007 09:00 AM before Judge Inge P Johnson in Bham AL; parties are ordered to submit report of parties' planning in accord with this trial date. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 2/15/07. (ASL, )
February 14, 2007 Filing 10 RESPONSE to re #6 the Court's Order Setting Hearing and Notice of Consent to Federal Jurisdiction Under CAFA filed by Willie Jones, Riverside Texaco, Gladys Pullen. (Robertson, Alyce)
February 14, 2007 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Occidental Chemical Corporation, David Ryskoski, Anita Mitchell, filed by Willie Jones, Riverside Texaco, Gladys Pullen.(Robertson, Alyce)
February 12, 2007 Filing 8 NOTICE by Occidental Chemical Corporation Filing Proof of Notice of Removal in State Court (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Removal to State Court)(Alston, Michael)
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for extension of time to respond to plas' complaint; dfts have until 3/9/07 in which to file a response . Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 2/12/07. (ASL, )
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal ; Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/27/2007 01:30 PM before Judge Inge P Johnson.. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 2/12/07. (ASL, )
February 8, 2007 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to pla's complaint by Occidental Chemical Corporation, David Ryskoski, Anita Mitchell. (MAA, )
February 8, 2007 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Occidental Chemical Corporation (MAA, )
February 8, 2007 Filing 3 Memorandum to Clek regarding filing of notice of removal in state court(MAA, )
February 8, 2007 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K Alston on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation, David Ryskoski, Anita Mitchell (MAA, )
February 8, 2007 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Occidental Chemical Corporation, David Ryskoski, Anita Mitchell, from Circuit Court Colbert County, Alabama, case number CV07-12. ( Filing fee $ 350.00 Receipt 200 233664 )(MAA, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riverside Texaco et al v. Occidental Chemical Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Hampton
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas L Hampton
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Hampton
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Hampton
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas L Haney
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary L Harris
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Harris
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L Hayes
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romelia C Hogan
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Hollingsworth, Sr
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Hood
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ester Horrison
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris L Howard
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia F Howard
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leotha Ingram, Jr
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollis Isbell
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Jackson
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L Jackson
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerita Jackson
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Jackson, Jr
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert L Jarmon
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Jarmon
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Jarmon
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Jarmon
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Jarmon
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Johnson
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Governor O Johnson, Jr
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Johnson
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda M Johnson
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Johnson, Jr
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary D Jones
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Jones, Jr
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie L Jones
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby E Jones
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Elaine Jones
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie B Jones
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Percy L Kimbrough
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David King
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon King
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmitt King, Jr
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmitt King, Sr
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda W King
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice H King
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent King
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie H King
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Knox
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W Landers
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary L Ledlow
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol A Lesley
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Lesley
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dickey G Lesley
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R Lewis
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny D Liles
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Lindsey
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie J Little
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Little, Sr
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Little
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Little
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie J Little, Sr
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry M Long
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Long
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian T Mars
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorene Martin
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion L Martin
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary G Mastin
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J Mayes
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R Mayes
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Mayes
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ester McAfee
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth McDaniel
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie McDuffle, Jr
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma McGaha
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret McNeece
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna T McPherson
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Meade
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Meadows
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadell Meredith
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weston C Metcalf
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion D Mims
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Mitchell
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah W Mitchell
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda R Mitchell
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo C Montgomery
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella Moss
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail W Mullens
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Neloms, Jr
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Neloms, III
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Neloms
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Percy L Neloms
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Neloms
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William M Neloms
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde W Newsome
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Newsome, Jr
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Towanda Nixon
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Oliver
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Owen
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Pearsall
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattie Penn
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie B Peters
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy L Phillips
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward W Phillips
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott G Phillips
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Phillips
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zela M Phillips
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Poellnitz
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Pounders
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Pratt
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby A Pruitt
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar E Pruitt
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karel Pruitt
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelia Pullen
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariko Redcross
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riley D Reels
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary H Ricks
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ricks
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William D Ricks
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Ross
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judge D Royal
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattie Russell
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Queen E Rutland
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ollie Sanders, Jr
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia K Sanders
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lugertha Sharpley
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie Smith
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora B Smith
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horace J Smith
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry D Smith
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Smith
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Smith
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinson T Smith
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William M Smith
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E Speegle
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard C Stanley
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Stowe
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille B Suttle
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia G Terry
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille P Thomas
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alonzo Thompson
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aneitha Thompson
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie P Thompson
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecelia Thompson
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claiborn B Thompson
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leatha A Thompson
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E Thompson
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie Tidwell
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dayle A Turner
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nazery B Turner
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude B Vernon, Jr
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E Vess
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Vinson
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Vinson
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nellie P Vinson
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda B Warren
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred W Warren
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnie L Warren
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Watson
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Watts
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter B Watts
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar O Watts, Jr
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar O Watts, III
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Weakley
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ollie Weaver
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie L West
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy White
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie R Whiteside
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol A Whiteside
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Whiteside
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Whiteside, Jr
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terilyn Whiteside
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A Williams
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lula M Williams
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruthie P Williams
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riley L Young
Represented By: Alyce Street Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?