Andazola v. Logan's Roadhouse, Inc.

Plaintiff: Brandy A Andazola
Defendant: Logan's Roadhouse, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00316
Filed: February 10, 2010
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Lauderdale
Presiding Judge: C Lynwood Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 05/24/13. (SPT )
May 10, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the portion of defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Witnessas and Exhibits that were not timely and properly disclosed during discovery that requests exclusion of the DVD entitled "Muffy the Vampire Slayer" is GRANTED as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 5/10/2013. (AHI)
April 29, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the court DENIES plaintiff's motion forleave to serve a trial witness subpoena on former Regional Manager DavidRodriguez and motion for leave to file letters; the court GRANTS defendant's motion to exclude evidence of alleged damages incurred by plaintiff after resignation and the motion to exclude evidence of dismissed claims; the court DENIES defendant's motion to bifurcate the trial into liabilityand damages phases, motion to exclude evidence o f Florence Kitchen Manager Peter Austin's expression of breast milk and motion to exclude evidence of defendants failure to promote plaintiff to the General Manager position of defendant's Athens restaurant; Defendant's motion to exclu de evidence of alleged harassment of other employees and harassment not based on sex, including any complaints of such harassment is GRANTED in part and held in ABEYANCE in part; defendant's motion to exclude witnesses and exhibits not disclosed during discovery is GRANTED in part, DENIED in part, and held in ABEYANCE in part; Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit copies of the said DVD to the court and defense counsel within 7 days of the date of this order; as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 4/29/2013. (AHI )
May 15, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER that the plaintiff's motion for sanctions is DENIED; as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 5/15/2012. (AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andazola v. Logan's Roadhouse, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy A Andazola
Represented By: Michael L Weathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan's Roadhouse, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?