Tuscumbia City School System v. Pharmacia Corporation

Plaintiff: Tuscumbia City School System
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv00332
Filed: January 31, 2012
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Colbert
Presiding Judge: C Lynwood Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the motion to exclude expert testimony filed by defendant Pharmacia Corporation is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; The motion is GRANTED as to the testimony of Dr. Shaun Crawford, Matthew Hageman, Michael Heard, Dr. James Olson, and Robert Thompson, and the testimony of those witnesses is EXCLUDED; The motion as to Dr. Lois George is DENIED as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 2/12/2015. (AHI )
June 20, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the defendant's motion to dismiss Count III of the third amended complaint is GRANTED, and the remainder of that complaint is STRICKEN; Plaintiff's motion to allow the third amended complaint as filed is DENIED; it is ORDERED that the second amended complaint also is STRICKEN, which leaves the first amended complaint as the operative pleading as more fully set out in order Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 6/20/2013. (AHI)
November 27, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that defendant's motion to dismiss is DENIED, defendant's alternative motion for a more definite statement is GRANTED and plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint that more definitely states Count III by 12/5/2012, as more fully set out in orer. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 11/27/2012. (AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tuscumbia City School System v. Pharmacia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tuscumbia City School System
Represented By: Wesley W Barnett
Represented By: D Frank Davis
Represented By: John E Norris
Represented By: Courtney L Peinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Augusta S Dowd
Represented By: Linda G Flippo
Represented By: Matthew H Lembke
Represented By: Michael R Pennington
Represented By: J Mark White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?