Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Tennessee Valley Authority
Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth, Alabama Center for Sustainable Energy, Center for Biological Diversity, GASP, Southern Alliance for Clean Energy and Alabama Center for Sustainable Energy doing business as Energy Alabama
Defendant: Tennessee Valley Authority
Case Number: 3:2018cv01446
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alabama Center for Sustainable Energy, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, GASP, Southern Alliance for Clean Energy. Tennessee Valley Authority waiver sent on 9/18/2018, answer due 11/17/2018. (Howard, Crystal) Modified on 10/18/2018 (AHI).
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - This case is being reassigned from Judge Coogler to Judge Liles Burke. Please use case number 3:18-CV-1446-LCB on all subsequent pleadings (AHI)
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to Tennessee Valley Authority. (AHI)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 9/07/2018. (TLM2)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 9/7/2018. (TLM2)
September 6, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $50, receipt number H4601003669, Manual Receipt #226405 (AHI )
September 6, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $50, receipt number H4601003668, Manual Receipt # 226404 (AHI)
September 6, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number H4601003667; Manual Receipt# 226403 (AHI)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding case assigned to unassigned judge; this case has been referred to Judge Coogler until further notice. Please use case number 3:18-CV-1446-UJH-LSC on all subsequent pleadings (AHI)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV for Jean Su by Alabama Center for Sustainable Energy, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, GASP, and Southern Alliance for Clean Energy. (AHI)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV for Howard M. Crystal by Alabama Center for Sustainable Energy, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, GASP, and Southern Alliance for Clean Energy. (AHI)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Alabama Center for Sustainable Energy, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, GASP, and Southern Alliance for Clean Energy (AHI)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tennessee Valley Authority filed by GASP, Center for Biological Diversity, Alabama Center for Sustainable Energy, Southern Alliance for Clean Energy, and Friends of the Earth.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Tennessee Valley Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth
Represented By: Howard M Crystal
Represented By: Anchun Jean Su
Represented By: R David McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Center for Sustainable Energy
Represented By: Howard M Crystal
Represented By: Anchun Jean Su
Represented By: R David McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Howard M Crystal
Represented By: Anchun Jean Su
Represented By: R David McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GASP
Represented By: Howard M Crystal
Represented By: Anchun Jean Su
Represented By: R David McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Alliance for Clean Energy
Represented By: Howard M Crystal
Represented By: Anchun Jean Su
Represented By: R David McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Center for Sustainable Energy doing business as Energy Alabama
Represented By: Howard M Crystal
Represented By: Anchun Jean Su
Represented By: R David McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Valley Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?