Whitson v. Coker et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Whitson
Defendant: Bryce Graham, Jr, Chad D Coker and Harold V Hughston, Jr
Case Number: 3:2018cv01972
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the court having received prisoner consent form the Warden is directed to deduct Monthly Payments from Prison Account of KENNETH WAYNE WHITSON. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 1/10/2019. (PSM)
December 21, 2018 Filing fee: $ 1.00, receipt number H4601003842 (TLM, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 Prisoner consent form by Kenneth Wayne Whitson (TLM, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE to re #4 filed by Kenneth Wayne Whitson. (TLM, )
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER terming motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is required to pay a partial filing fee, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 12/4/2018. (PSM)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT by Kenneth Wayne Whitson. (TLM, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth Wayne Whitson. (TLM, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chad D Coker, Bryce Graham, Jr, Harold V Hughston, Jr, filed by Kenneth Wayne Whitson.(TLM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitson v. Coker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryce Graham, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad D Coker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold V Hughston, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Whitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?