Nelson v. Ruth Star Inc et al

Plaintiff: Sarah Beth Nelson
Defendant: Melaku Demis and Ruth Star Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00550
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: certain time limits apply as set out in this order; Mediation by 12/31/2019; Discovery due by 1/31/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 3/2/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 9:45 AM in the US Post Office & Courthouse, Decatur, AL; Jury Trial set for 11/16/2020 at 9:00 AM in John McKinley Federal Building, Florence, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/28/2019. (AFS)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Little, Thomas)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligation under FRCP26(f)- with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 4/30/2019. (KSS)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Ruth Star Inc (Little, Thomas)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/19/2019.; Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 9:45 AM; Jury Trial set for 11/16/2020 at 9:00 AM; BOTH in the US Post Office & Courthouse, Decatur, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 4/19/2019. (AFS)
April 17, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400, (ALND B460196891) receipt_number 1126-3325904. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Melaku Demis, Ruth Star Inc from Circuit Court of Colbert County, Alabama, case number 20-cv-2018-900260, filed by Melaku Demis, Ruth Star Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(KEK). (Little, Thomas) Modified on 4/19/2019 (AFS).
April 11, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Melaku Demis, Ruth Star Inc. See #1 , Exhibit A, page 20. (KEK)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Melaku Demis, Ruth Star Inc from Circuit Court of Colbert County, Alabama, case number 20-cv-2018-900260, filed by Melaku Demis, Ruth Star Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Ruth Star Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melaku Demis
Represented By: Thomas M Little
Represented By: Todd N Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Star Inc
Represented By: Thomas M Little
Represented By: Todd N Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Beth Nelson
Represented By: John M Kennemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?