Greenhill v. Medical Data Systems Inc
Plaintiff: Gregory Greenhill
Defendant: Medical Data Systems Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00787
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/15/2019. (AHI)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Medical Data Systems Inc. filed by Medical Data Systems Inc (Leeth, Alan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Medical Data Systems Inc.(Leeth, Alan)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Medical Data Systems Inc served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (AHI)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Medical Data Systems Inc. (AHI)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald C Sykstus on behalf of Gregory Greenhill (Sykstus, Ronald)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 05/24/2019. (KBW)
May 23, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3353837. (B4601097931) (Philipps, David)
May 23, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3353836.(B4601097930) (Philipps, David)
May 23, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3353831 (B4601097928). related document #1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Medical Data Systems Inc filed by Gregory Greenhill. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(AHI). (Philipps, David)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV for David Philipps and Mary Philipps by Gregory Greenhill. (AHI)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Gregory Greenhill. (AHI)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Medical Data Systems Inc filed by Gregory Greenhill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenhill v. Medical Data Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Data Systems Inc
Represented By: Alan D Leeth
Represented By: Rachel R Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Greenhill
Represented By: Ronald C Sykstus
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?