Gooch v. Doris et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Brock Allen Gooch
Defendant: Jail Administrator Marcus, Frank Williams and Nurse Doris
Case Number: 3:2019cv00931
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Northwestern Office
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER the Plaintiff has named the same defendants and made the same or similar claims in Case No. 3:19-cv-00732-LSC-JHE. The complaint in this case is therefore largely duplicative of the complaint in the earlier numbered case. In the interest of judicial economy, this action is due to be administratively closed as duplicative of Case No. 3:19-cv-00732-LSC-JHE. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/24/2019. (AFS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:19-cv-00331. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 17, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 6/17/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing that: (1) the #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; (2) this case is transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 USC 1404; directing the clerk to take the necessary steps to effectuate the transfer of this action; this case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/17/19. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 6/17/2019.]
June 14, 2019 No objections filed to the #3 Recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry)(kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 6/17/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Objections to R&R due by 5/29/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 5/13/2019. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 6/17/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Brock Allen Gooch. (es, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 6/17/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Nurse Doris, Jail Administrator Marcus, Frank Williams, filed by Brock Allen Gooch.(es, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 6/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gooch v. Doris et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jail Administrator Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Doris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brock Allen Gooch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?