Clark v. CBC LLC

Plaintiff: Gregory Clark, Jr.
Defendant: CBC LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01117
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: it is ORDERED that all claims be DISMISSED with prejudice, but upon this condition: if the parties have not executed a settlement agreement by September 16, 2019, the plaintiff may petition the Court to reinstate this action, and such reinstatement shall relate back to the original date of filing. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/8/19. (BJL)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Gregory Clark, Jr of Settlement (Philipps, David)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CBC LLC, filed by Gregory Clark, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Group E)(Philipps, David)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed CBC LLC served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (AHI)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to CBC LLC. (AHI)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald C Sykstus on behalf of Gregory Clark, Jr (Sykstus, Ronald)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/17/2019. (KBW)
July 17, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3391956 (B4601099204). (Philipps, David)
July 17, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3391951 (B4601099203). (Philipps, David)
July 17, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3391935 (B4601099202). related document #1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against CBC LLC filed by Gregory Clark, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(AHI). (Philipps, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV by David and Elizabeth Philipps by Gregory Clark, Jr. (AHI)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Gregory Clark, Jr. (AHI)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against CBC LLC filed by Gregory Clark, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. CBC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Clark, Jr.
Represented By: Ronald C Sykstus
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?