Keeton v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Sondra Davis Keeton
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2019cv01277
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 8/28/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (AFS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General delivered to USMS with form 285 for service. (AFS)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/19/2019. (AFS)
August 9, 2019 NOTICE that counsel for the plaintiff shall provide the plaintiff's social security number to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. This notice is to be made outside of the electronic filing system. (AFS)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sondra Davis Keeton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(AFS)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Sondra Davis Keeton. (Attachments: #1 AC Decision)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keeton v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sondra Davis Keeton
Represented By: Seth B Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?