Bragwell v. Optimum Outcomes Inc
Plaintiff: Melissa Bragwell
Defendant: Optimum Outcomes Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv02018
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DISMISSAL ORDER: Pursuant to Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 1/3/20. (BJL)
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Melissa Bragwell (Philipps, David)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the court STAYS all further proceedings in this case a ORDERS plaintiff to file a status report or stipulation of dismissal by 2/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/30/2019. (AHI )
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Optimum Outcomes Inc served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (AHI)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Melissa Bragwell Settlement (Philipps, David)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Optimum Outcomes Inc by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on December 16, 2019. (ADH)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald C Sykstus on behalf of Melissa Bragwell (Sykstus, Ronald)
December 16, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3496746 (B4601102716). (Philipps, David) Modified on 12/18/2019 (BJL).
December 16, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3496741 (receipt number B4601102715). (Philipps, David) Modified on 12/18/2019 (BJL).
December 16, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3496735 (receipt number B4601102714). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Optimum Outcomes Inc filed by Melissa Bragwell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(BJL). (Philipps, David) Modified on 12/18/2019 (BJL).
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps Motion is RIPE 12/13/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Melissa Bragwell. (BJL)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Melissa Bragwell. (BJL)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Optimum Outcomes Inc filed by Melissa Bragwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bragwell v. Optimum Outcomes Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optimum Outcomes Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Bragwell
Represented By: Ronald C Sykstus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?