Muhammad v. Pilgrim's Pride Corporation
Plaintiff: Larry Muhammad
Defendant: Pilgrim's Pride Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00387
Filed: March 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this case has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Madeline Hughes Haikala. Please use case number 3:20-cv-387-MHH on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' settlement efforts, the court CANCELS the teleconference set for 4/27/2020 at 10:30 A.M. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/20/2020. (AHI)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Continue. Defendant shall file (1) any reply in further support of its Motion to Dismiss; and (2) a response to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by April 27, 2020. Plaintiff shall file any reply in further support of his Motion to Remand by May 4, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on April 10, 2020. (HKM)
April 10, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Continue Motion is RIPE 4/10/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Pilgrim's Pride Corporation. (Cross, Kristen)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Defendant shall file (1) any reply in further support of its Motion to Dismiss; and (2) a response to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by April 17, 2020. Plaintiff shall file any reply in further support of his Motion to Remand by April 24, 2020. This order supersedes the deadlines set forth in the courts March 30, 2020, order, in which it ordered Defendant to file any reply in further support of its Motion to Dismiss within 7 days after Plaintiff filed a response in opposition thereto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/6/20. (BJL)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Larry Muhammad. Defendant shall file a response within 14 days of the entry date of this order. Plaintiff shall file any reply within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/3/20. (BJL)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief filed by Larry Muhammad. (Jenkins, R)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Larry Muhammad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Jenkins, R)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than May 11, 2020, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/30/20. (BJL)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court SETS a telephone status conference for 10:30 a.m. on Monday, April 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/30/20. (BJL)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: On March 27, 2020, Defendant filed a motion to dismiss. Plaintiff shall file a response within fourteen days of the entry date of this order. Defendant shall file any reply within seven days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/30/20. (BJL)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief by Pilgrim's Pride Corporation. (Cross, Kristen)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pilgrim's Pride Corporation. filed by Pilgrim's Pride Corporation (Cross, Kristen)
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pilgrim's Pride Corporation from The Circuit Court of Colbert County, Alabama, case number 20-CV-2019-900373. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BJL)
December 11, 2019 First Amended Complaint filed in State Court on 12/11/19. (BJL) Modified on 3/20/2020 (BJL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. Pilgrim's Pride Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Muhammad
Represented By: R Willson Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilgrim's Pride Corporation
Represented By: James S Williams
Represented By: Kristen S Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?