James et al v. Kalab Transportation et al
Plaintiff: Donald Steve James and Larry Ray James
Defendant: Kalab Transportation, Able Chiteshe and Micheck Muchele
Case Number: 3:2020cv00542
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Anderson, Andrew)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/2/2020. (AHI)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Liles C. Burke. Please use case number 3:20-cv-542-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Micheck Muchele.(Anderson, Andrew)
April 23, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601105535 (AHI)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial (AHI )
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND in Complaint by Micheck Muchele from Circuit Court of Colbert County, Alabama, case number 20-cv-2020-900067filed by Able Chiteshe, Kalab Transportation, Micheck Muchele. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James et al v. Kalab Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalab Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Able Chiteshe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheck Muchele
Represented By: Lea Richmond, IV
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Steve James
Represented By: Albert J Trousdale, II
Represented By: Basil Timothy Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Ray James
Represented By: Albert J Trousdale, II
Represented By: Basil Timothy Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?