Hekhamenesh v. Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc
Plaintiff: Jahan Hekhamenesh
Defendant: Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00590
Filed: April 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: that certain time limits and deadlines apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 2/19/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 3/19/2021; Trial ready by 8/2021; A Status Conference is set for 12/18/2020 08:45 AM in John McKinley Federal Building, Florence, AL. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/26/2020. (AHI)
June 12, 2020 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fawal, A)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: a Motion Hearing re: dft's #2 MOTION to Dismiss is set for 6/26/2020 at 08:30 a.m. in the John McKinley Federal Building, Florence, AL before the undersigned. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/02/20. (SPT )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER denying #13 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/26/2020. (RAC)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of its Motion to Dismiss by Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc. (Fawal, A)
May 21, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to re #8 Plaintiff's Response to AWG's Motion to Dismiss filed by Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc. (Fawal, A)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/21/2020. (AHI)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference scheduled for 5/28/2020 is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/21/20. (BJL)
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this case has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Liles C. Burke. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL)
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jahan Hekhamenesh. (Snodgrass, Lucas)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than June 12, 2020, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/30/20. (BJL)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 5/28/2020 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/30/20. (BJL) Modified on 5/21/2020 (BJL).
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The court ORDERS Plaintiff to respond to the motion to dismiss within fourteen days of the date of this order. Defendant must file a reply within seven days of Plaintiffs response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/30/20. (BJL)
April 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc. (BJL)
April 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BJL)
April 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc from The Circuit Court of Lauderdale County, Alabama, case number 41-CV-2020-900104. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hekhamenesh v. Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc
Represented By: Jorge Arturo Solis
Represented By: A David Fawal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jahan Hekhamenesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?