Dudley v. Singleton et al
Plaintiff: Laurie Dudley
Defendant: Steven Carlton, Rick Singleton and David Dison
Case Number: 3:2020cv00626
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12117ad
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 20 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Laurie Dudley, Steven Carlton, Rick Singleton, and David Dison. (BJL)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: the court DENIES the Motions to Dismiss at MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/1/20. (BJL)
June 30, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to re #17 , #16 filed by Steven Carlton, David Dison, Rick Singleton. (McNeill, J)
June 23, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Laurie Dudley. (Fonteneau, Kira)
June 23, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Laurie Dudley. (Fonteneau, Kira)
June 23, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Laurie Dudley.(Fonteneau, Kira)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court CANCELS the telephone status conference previously scheduled for Thursday, July 23, 2020, and RESETS it for 9:30 a.m. on Wednesday, July 8, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/23/20. (BJL)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than July 23, 2020, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/9/20. (BJL)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court SETS a telephone status conference for 9:30 a.m. on Thursday, July 23, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/9/20. (BJL) Modified on 6/23/2020 (BJL). Modified on 7/2/2020 (BJL).
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The court ORDERS Plaintiff to separately respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss within 14 days of the date of this order. Defendants must file replies within 7 days of Plaintiff's responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/9/20. (BJL)
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 Brief re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Steven Carlton, David Dison. (McNeill, J)
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Steven Carlton, David Dison. (McNeill, J)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 Brief re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rick Singleton. (McNeill, J)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Rick Singleton. (McNeill, J)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Steven Carlton served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020; David Dison served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020; Rick Singleton served - no date of delivery on green card. (BJL)
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Steven Carlton, David Dison, and Rick Singleton. (AHI)
May 6, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3584891 (receipt number B4601105765). related document #1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Steven Carlton, David Dison, and Rick Singleton filed by Laurie Dudley.(AHI). (Fonteneau, Kira) Modified on 5/7/2020 (BJL).
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (AHI )
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 CONFLICT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Laurie Dudley (AHI)
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Laurie Dudley. (AHI)
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Steven Carlton, David Dison, and Rick Singleton filed by Laurie Dudley.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dudley v. Singleton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Carlton
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Singleton
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Dison
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Dudley
Represented By: Kira Y Fonteneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?