Nutrien AG Solutions Inc v. Counts et al
Plaintiff: Nutrien AG Solutions Inc and Crop Production Services Inc
Defendant: Claude Price Counts, III individually doing business as Counts Farms, Tommy Lorne Counts and Counts Farms Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv01049
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: that certain time limits and deadlines apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 4/15/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 5/17/2021; Trial ready by 10/2021; Status Conference set for 2/22/2021 01:30 PM in John McKinley Federal Building, Florence, AL. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/10/2020. (AHI )
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/9/2020. (AHI)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sefton, Patrick)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Claude Price Counts, III, Tommy Lorne Counts, Counts Farms Inc.(Wright, Grant)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nutrien AG Solutions Inc. Counts Farms Inc served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Sefton, Patrick)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nutrien AG Solutions Inc. Tommy Lorne Counts served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Sefton, Patrick)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nutrien AG Solutions Inc. Claude Price Counts, III served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Sefton, Patrick)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to Claude Price Counts, III, Tommy Lorne Counts,and Counts Farms Inc. (AHI )
July 24, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3635986 (B4601107349). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Nutrien AG Solutions Inc, Claude Price Counts, III, and Tommy Lorne Counts filed by Nutrien AG Solutions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(AHI ). (Sefton, Patrick) Modified on 7/28/2020 (AHI).
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Nutrien AG Solutions Inc (AHI)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nutrien AG Solutions Inc, Claude Price Counts, III, and Tommy Lorne Counts filed by Nutrien AG Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(AHI )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutrien AG Solutions Inc v. Counts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nutrien AG Solutions Inc
Represented By: Patrick L.W. Sefton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crop Production Services Inc
Represented By: Patrick L.W. Sefton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claude Price Counts, III individually doing business as Counts Farms
Represented By: Grant A Wright
Represented By: Max Daniel Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Lorne Counts
Represented By: Grant A Wright
Represented By: Max Daniel Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Counts Farms Inc
Represented By: Grant A Wright
Represented By: Max Daniel Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?