Smith v. Persolve LLC
Plaintiff: Kendrick Smith
Defendant: Persolve LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Account Resolution Associates
Case Number: 3:2020cv01209
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER cancelling the October 23, 2020, telephone status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on October 13, 2020. (HKM)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Pursuant to Plaintiff's Notice of Settlement, the court STAYS all current deadlines until November 27, 2020. The parties shall take appropriate action to perfect settlement by November 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/13/20. (BJL)
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Kendrick Smith of Settlement (Philipps, David)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than November 9, 2020, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/23/20. (BJL)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The court SETS a telephone status conference for 10:00 a.m. on Friday, October 23, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/23/20. (BJL) Modified on 10/13/2020 (BJL).
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/23/20. (BJL)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J Wilkins on behalf of All Defendants (Wilkins, Robert)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Persolve LLC.(Wilkins, Robert)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Persolve LLC served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (BJL)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Persolve LLC. Mailed certified mail (MEB2)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/20/20. (BJL)
August 20, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3654694 (B4601107923). (Philipps, David) Modified on 8/21/2020 (BJL).
August 20, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3654691 (B4601107922). (Philipps, David) Modified on 8/21/2020 (BJL).
August 20, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3654650 (B4601107921). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Persolve LLC filed by Kendrick Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(BJL). (Philipps, David) Modified on 8/21/2020 (BJL).
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald C Sykstus on behalf of Kendrick Smith (Sykstus, Ronald)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps Motion is RIPE 8/19/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Kendrick Smith. (BJL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Kendrick Smith. (BJL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Persolve LLC filed by Kendrick Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Persolve LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick Smith
Represented By: Ronald C Sykstus
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Persolve LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Account Resolution Associates
Represented By: Robert J Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?