Saks v. Lester et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Saks doing business as Sak Capital Partners LLC
Defendant: Timothy P Lester, Moseley & Lester, Larry Bennett, Key Resource Financial Board and Jacqui Bennett
Case Number: 3:2022cv01628
Filed: December 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Alternatively, Motion to Quash Service filed by Eugene Saks. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit with Ex's A - E)(Heard, Kevin)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Court SETS a Telephone Status Conference for 3/13/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/10/2023. (LCB)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: That the parties are required to enter an election regarding the exercise of jurisdiction by a magistrate judge no later than March 27, 2023; in the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is directed to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after March 27, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/10/2023. (LCB)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion #13 within 14 days of the date of this order; Defendant's shall file any reply within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/10/2023. (LCB)
February 9, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Alternatively, Motion to Quash Service by Timothy P Lester, Moseley & Lester. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Timothy P. Lester)(Moon, Stacy)
February 6, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Key Resource Financial Board. (LCB)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #10 Motion for Extension of Time; Defendants must respond to Plaintiff's complaint by February 9, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 1/31/2023. (LCB)
January 30, 2023 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond Motion is RIPE 1/30/2023. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Timothy P Lester, Moseley & Lester. (Richter, Jeremy)
January 12, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Moseley & Lester served on 1/9/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. (LCB)
January 12, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Timothy P Lester served on 1/9/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. (LCB)
January 3, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Jacqui Bennett, Larry Bennett, Key Resource Financial Board, Timothy P Lester, and Moseley & Lester. (AHI)
January 3, 2023 Filing 6 Request for service by certified mail filed by Eugene Saks. (Heard, Kevin)
January 3, 2023 Filing 5 Request for service by certified mail filed by Eugene Saks. (Heard, Kevin)
January 3, 2023 Filing 4 Request for service by certified mail filed by Eugene Saks. (Heard, Kevin)
January 3, 2023 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Eugene Saks. (Heard, Kevin)
January 3, 2023 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Eugene Saks. (Heard, Kevin)
January 3, 2023 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4239472 (B-2986). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Larry Bennett, Key Resource Financial Board, Timothy P Lester, Moseley & Lester, filed by Eugene Saks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(KAM). (Heard, Kevin)
December 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Larry Bennett, Key Resource Financial Board, Timothy P Lester, Moseley & Lester and Jacqui Bennett, filed by Eugene Saks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saks v. Lester et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Saks doing business as Sak Capital Partners LLC
Represented By: Kevin D Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy P Lester
Represented By: Stacy L Moon
Represented By: Jeremy W Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moseley & Lester
Represented By: Jeremy W Richter
Represented By: Stacy L Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Resource Financial Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqui Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?