Seal v. VGW LTD et al
Plaintiff: Amy Nicole Seal
Defendant: VGW LTD, VGW Holdings US INC, VGW US Inc and VGW Luckyland Inc
Case Number: 3:2023cv00462
Filed: April 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: C Lynwood Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2023 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court of Franklin County, Alabama filed by Amy Nicole Seal. (Ware, Dargan)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #11 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV for Behnam Dayanim. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 5/24/2023. (AHI)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #10 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV for Richard A. Jacobsen. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 5/24/2023. (AHI)
May 25, 2023 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4349527 (B-5453). (Earnhardt, John) Modified on 5/25/2023 (AHI).
May 25, 2023 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4349525 (B-5452). (Earnhardt, John) Modified on 5/25/2023 (AHI).
May 23, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Behnam Dayanim by VGW Holdings US INC, VGW LTD, VGW Luckyland Inc, VGW US Inc. (Earnhardt, John)
May 23, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard A. Jacobsen by VGW Holdings US INC, VGW LTD, VGW Luckyland Inc, VGW US Inc. (Earnhardt, John)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #8 motion for leave to file a reply to defendants' opposition to motion to remand and re ply is due by 5/30/2023. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 5/23/2023. (AHI)
May 22, 2023 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Amy Nicole Seal. (Ware, Dargan)
May 19, 2023 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by VGW Holdings US INC, VGW LTD, VGW Luckyland Inc, VGW US Inc. (Earnhardt, John)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The defendants are to response to the motion to remand by 5/19/2023. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 4/28/2023. (AHI)
April 27, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Amy Nicole Seal. (Ware, Dargan)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court GRANTS #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall their respond to plaintiff's complaint no later than 10 days following the court's ruling on the anticipated motion of remand. If plaintiff fails to file a motion to remand within thirty days of the notice of removal as required, defendants shall file their response to plaintiff's complaint by 5/22/2023. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 4/17/2023. (AHI)
April 12, 2023 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by VGW Holdings US INC, VGW LTD, VGW Luckyland Inc, VGW US Inc. (Earnhardt, John)
April 12, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VGW Holdings US INC, VGW LTD, VGW Luckyland Inc, VGW US Inc. filed by VGW Holdings US INC, VGW LTD, VGW Luckyland Inc, VGW US Inc (Earnhardt, John)
April 12, 2023 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4317399 (B-4755). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VGW US Inc, VGW LTD, VGW Holdings US INC, and VGW Luckyland Inc from Circuit Court of Franklin County, Alabama, case number 33-cv-2023-900031 filed by VGW US Inc, VGW LTD, VGW Holdings US INC, and VGW Luckyland Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(AHI). (Earnhardt, John) Modified on 4/12/2023 (AHI).
April 11, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VGW US Inc, VGW LTD, VGW Holdings US INC, and VGW Luckyland Inc from Circuit Court of Franklin County, Alabama, case number 33-cv-2023-900031 filed by VGW US Inc, VGW LTD, VGW Holdings US INC, and VGW Luckyland Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seal v. VGW LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Nicole Seal
Represented By: D Frank Davis
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Represented By: Jeffrey L Bowling
Represented By: John E Norris
Represented By: Wesley W Barnett
Represented By: John Edward Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW LTD
Represented By: Ana Carmen Chambers
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Richard Jacobsen
Represented By: Behnam Dayanim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW Holdings US INC
Represented By: Ana Carmen Chambers
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Richard Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW US Inc
Represented By: Ana Carmen Chambers
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Richard Jacobsen
Represented By: Behnam Dayanim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW Luckyland Inc
Represented By: Ana Carmen Chambers
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Behnam Dayanim
Represented By: Richard Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?