Mills v. ZYNGA Inc
Plaintiff: Gayla Hamilton Mills
Defendant: ZYNGA Inc
Case Number: 3:2023cv00463
Filed: April 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER that a Motion Hearing regarding the #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Gayla Hamilton Mills is set for 9:00 a.m. on 7/6/23 in the John McKinley Federal Building, Florence, AL before Judge Liles C Burke; No later than June 30, 2023, Parties shall file with the Court a list of top five cases supporting their position, in order of preference. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/5/23. (SPT )
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court of Franklin County, Alabama filed by Gayla Hamilton Mills. (Ware, Dargan)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Behnam Dayanim Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/25/23. (SPT )
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Richard A. Jacobsen Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/25/23. (SPT )
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4349534 (B-5455). (Earnhardt, John) Modified on 5/25/2023 (AHI).
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4349530 (B-5454). (Earnhardt, John) Modified on 5/25/2023 (AHI).
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Behnam Dayanim by ZYNGA Inc. (Earnhardt, John)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard A. Jacobsen by ZYNGA Inc. (Earnhardt, John)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ZYNGA Inc. (Earnhardt, John)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's #15 Unopposed Motion to Extend. The deadline for the parties Rule 26(f) Report shall be suspended until after the Court rules on Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/2/2023. (AHI)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time of Rule 26f Conference Deadline by ZYNGA Inc. (Earnhardt, John)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/1/2023. (AHI)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Status Conference set for May 25, 2023 at 10:00 am before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson Jr. is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/1/2023. (LCB)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this action has been randomly reassigned to the HONORABLE LILES C. BURKE. Please use case number 3:23-cv-463-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N. Johnson, Jr is no longer assigned to this case. (LCB)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Court GRANTS #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Defendant shall file response by May 19, 2023. Plaintiff shall file any reply within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/28/2023. (LCB)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Unopposed Motion to Extend Motion is RIPE 4/28/2023. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by ZYNGA Inc. (Earnhardt, John)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court SETS a Telephone Status Conference for May 25, 2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/28/2023. (LCB)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: That the parties are required to enter an election regarding the exercise of jurisdiction by a magistrate judge no later than June 11, 2023; in the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is directed to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after June 11, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/28/2023. (LCB)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Defendant shall file a response to the motion #6 within 14 days of the entry date of this order; Plaintiff shall file any reply within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/28/2023. (LCB)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Gayla Hamilton Mills. (Ware, Dargan)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court GRANTS #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and EXTENDS the response deadline by 10 days as more fully set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/13/2023. (LCB)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 4/12/2023. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by ZYNGA Inc. (Earnhardt, John)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZYNGA Inc. filed by ZYNGA Inc (Earnhardt, John)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402 (B-4753), receipt_number AALNDC-4317322. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL: by Gayla Hamilton Mills from Circuit Court of Frankin County, Alabama, case number 33-CV-23-900033.00, filed by Gayla Hamilton Mills. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(LCB). (Earnhardt, John)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of assignment of case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial.(LCB)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL: by ZYNGA Inc from Circuit Court of Frankin County, Alabama, case number 33-CV-23-900033.00, filed by (Earnhardt, John) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. ZYNGA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayla Hamilton Mills
Represented By: Jeffrey L Bowling
Represented By: D Frank Davis
Represented By: John Edward Norris
Represented By: Wesley W Barnett
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYNGA Inc
Represented By: Ana Carmen Chambers
Represented By: Behnam Dayanim
Represented By: Richard Jacobsen
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?