Long v. City of Sheffield Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Marvin Eugene Long
Defendant: City of Sheffield Alabama, County of Colbert Alabama, Max Dotson, Daniel Crews, Tommy Mills, Bradley Skipworth, Tim Vanderford, Curtis Burns, Brett Evans, Darien Foutain, Chief Terry Ricky, Sheriff Eric Balentine, Tyler Evans, Jonathan Harkins, Sheffield Police Dept, Colbert County Sheriff's Office and Mayor Steve Stanley
Case Number: 3:2023cv00731
Filed: June 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2023 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition the the #14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement Daniel Cruise, Tommy Mills, Bradley Skipworth, Tim Vanderford, Jonathan Harkins, and Tyler Evans filed by Marvin Eugene Long. (Daniel, Roderick) Modified on 7/31/2023 (AHI).
July 21, 2023 Filing 21 Brief re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Curtis Burns, City of Sheffield Alabama, Max Dotson, Brett Evans, Darien Foutain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Colbert County Circuit Court, CC-2022-24, Docket Sheet and Notice of Appeal)(Hyde, Robbie)
July 21, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Curtis Burns, City of Sheffield Alabama, Max Dotson, Brett Evans, Darien Foutain. (Hyde, Robbie)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS the unopposed motion (Doc. 16) of certain defendants (The City; Curtis Burns; Max Dotson; Brett Evans; Darien Fountain) for extension of time to file a responsive pleading; their deadline is now set for 11:59 PM CDT on Friday, July 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/7/2023. (AHI)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' motion (Doc. 13) is GRANTED, and the previously filed motions and briefs (Docs. 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12) are accordingly WITHDRAWN and STRICKEN from the record. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/7/023. (AHI)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/7/2023. (AHI)
July 6, 2023 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Curtis Burns, City of Sheffield Alabama, Max Dotson, Brett Evans, Darien Foutain. (Harmon, Bart)
July 6, 2023 Filing 15 Brief re #14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Daniel Crews, Tyler Evans, Jonathan Harkins, Tommy Mills, Bradley Skipworth, Tim Vanderford. (McNeill, J)
July 6, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement by Daniel Crews, Tyler Evans, Jonathan Harkins, Tommy Mills, Bradley Skipworth, Tim Vanderford. (McNeill, J)
June 26, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike #8 Brief, #7 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #10 Brief, #12 Brief, #6 Brief, #11 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement by Eric Balentine, Colbert County Sheriff's Office, County of Colbert Alabama, Daniel Crews, Tyler Evans, Jonathan Harkins, Tommy Mills, Bradley Skipworth, Tim Vanderford. (Frawley, Jamie)
June 26, 2023 Filing 12 ***WITHDRAWN AND STRICKEN BY TEXT ORDER ISSUED ON 7/7/2023*** Brief re #11 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Daniel Crews, Tyler Evans, Jonathan Harkins, Tommy Mills, Bradley Skipworth, Tim Vanderford. (McNeill, J) Modified on 7/7/2023 (AHI).
June 26, 2023 Filing 11 ***WITHDRAWN AND STRICKEN BY TEXT ORDER ISSUED ON 7/7/2023*** MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement by Daniel Crews, Tyler Evans, Jonathan Harkins, Tommy Mills, Bradley Skipworth, Tim Vanderford. (McNeill, J) Modified on 7/7/2023 (AHI).
June 26, 2023 Filing 10 ***WITHDRAWN AND STRICKEN BY TEXT ORDER ISSUED ON 7/7/2023*** Brief re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by County of Colbert Alabama. (McNeill, J) Modified on 7/7/2023 (AHI).
June 26, 2023 Filing 9 ***WITHDRAWN AND STRICKEN BY TEXT ORDER ISSUED ON 7/7/2023*** MOTION to Dismiss by County of Colbert Alabama. (McNeill, J) Modified on 7/7/2023 (AHI).
June 26, 2023 Filing 8 ***WITHDRAWN AND STRICKEN BY TEXT ORDER ISSUED ON 7/7/2023*** Brief re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Colbert County Sheriff's Office. (McNeill, J) Modified on 7/7/2023 (AHI).
June 26, 2023 Filing 7 ***WITHDRAWN AND STRICKEN BY TEXT ORDER ISSUED ON 7/7/2023*** MOTION to Dismiss by Colbert County Sheriff's Office. (McNeill, J) Modified on 7/7/2023 (AHI).
June 26, 2023 Filing 6 ***WITHDRAWN AND STRICKEN BY TEXT ORDER ISSUED ON 7/7/2023*** Brief re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eric Balentine. (McNeill, J) Modified on 7/7/2023 (AHI).
June 26, 2023 Filing 5 ***WITHDRAWN AND STRICKEN BY TEXT ORDER ISSUED ON 7/7/2023*** MOTION to Dismiss by Eric Balentine. (McNeill, J) Modified on 7/7/2023 (AHI).
June 22, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT MARVIN EUGENE LONG against All Defendants, filed by Marvin Eugene Long.(Daniel, Roderick)
June 8, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marvin Eugene Long. Eric Balentine served on 6/7/2023, answer due 6/28/2023; Curtis Burns served on 6/7/2023, answer due 6/28/2023; City of Sheffield Alabama served on 6/7/2023, answer due 6/28/2023; Colbert County Sheriff's Office served on 6/7/2023, answer due 6/28/2023; County of Colbert Alabama served on 6/7/2023, answer due 6/28/2023; Daniel Crews served on 6/7/2023, answer due 6/28/2023; Max Dotson served on 6/7/2023, answer due 6/28/2023; Brett Evans served on 6/7/2023, answer due 6/28/2023; Tyler Evans served on 6/7/2023, answer due 6/28/2023; Darien Foutain served on 6/7/2023, answer due 6/28/2023; Jonathan Harkins served on 6/7/2023, answer due 6/28/2023; Tommy Mills served on 6/7/2023, answer due 6/28/2023; Terry Ricky served on 6/7/2023, answer due 6/28/2023; Sheffield Police Dept served on 6/7/2023, answer due 6/28/2023; Bradley Skipworth served on 6/7/2023, answer due 6/28/2023; Steve Stanley served on 6/7/2023, answer due 6/28/2023; Tim Vanderford served on 6/7/2023, answer due 6/28/2023. (AHI)
June 6, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to Eric Balentine, Curtis Burns, City of Sheffield Alabama, Colbert County Sheriff's Office, County of Colbert Alabama, Daniel Crews, Max Dotson, Brett Evans, Tyler Evans, Darien Foutain, Jonathan Harkins, Tommy Mills, Terry Ricky, Sheffield Police Dept, Bradley Skipworth, Steve Stanley, and Tim Vanderford. (AHI)
June 6, 2023 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4357160 (B-5699). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Marvin Eugene Long.(AHI) Modified on 6/6/2023 (AHI).. (Daniel, Roderick) Modified on 6/6/2023 (AHI).
June 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Marvin Eugene Long.(AHI) Modified on 6/6/2023 (AHI).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. City of Sheffield Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Eugene Long
Represented By: Roderick Van Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sheffield Alabama
Represented By: Bart G Harmon
Represented By: Robbie Alexander Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Colbert Alabama
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Represented By: Jamie Helen Kidd Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Dotson
Represented By: Bart G Harmon
Represented By: Robbie Alexander Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Crews
Represented By: Jamie Helen Kidd Frawley
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Mills
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Represented By: Jamie Helen Kidd Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Skipworth
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Represented By: Jamie Helen Kidd Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Vanderford
Represented By: Jamie Helen Kidd Frawley
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Burns
Represented By: Bart G Harmon
Represented By: Robbie Alexander Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Evans
Represented By: Robbie Alexander Hyde
Represented By: Bart G Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darien Foutain
Represented By: Robbie Alexander Hyde
Represented By: Bart G Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Terry Ricky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Eric Balentine
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Represented By: Jamie Helen Kidd Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Evans
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Represented By: Jamie Helen Kidd Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Harkins
Represented By: Jamie Helen Kidd Frawley
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheffield Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colbert County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Represented By: Jamie Helen Kidd Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Steve Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?