Baker et al v. The Arevalo Agency LLC et al
Plaintiff: Erinn Baker and Jesse Baker
Defendant: The Arevalo Agency LLC, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company and Brittany Taylor
Case Number: 3:2023cv01559
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2024 Filing 17 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Brittany Taylor, The Arevalo Agency LLC.(Wright, Grant)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #15 Motion to vacate all deadlines and the parties have until 2/4/2024 to file a stipulated settlement agreement and dismissal. The Court also VACATES all deadlines in the Initial Order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 1/8/2024. (AHI)
January 5, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE by Erinn Baker, Jesse Baker Pro Tanto Settlement and MOTION to vacate deadlines (Herren, Andrew) Modified on 1/5/2024 (AHI).
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CLASS ACTION CERTIFICATION: Certain time limits and deadlines apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 9/13/202; Dispositive Motions due by 1/17/2025; Final Witness and Exhibit Lists due by 5/8/2025; Trial ready by 6/2025. An in person Status Conference is set for 7/17/2024 at 8:30 AM in John McKinley Federal Building, Florence, AL before Judge Liles C Burke. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 1/4/2024. (AHI)
January 2, 2024 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mitchell, Matthew)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Arevalo Agency LLC and Brittany Taylor's Unopposed Motion for extension of time to respond. Defendants shall file a response to the Plaintiff's complaint by January 8, 2024. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 12/8/2023. (LCB)
December 7, 2023 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Brittany Taylor, The Arevalo Agency LLC. (Wright, Grant)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint and Allstate's Response to plaintiffs' complaint is due by 1/8/2024. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 12/6/2023. (AHI)
December 4, 2023 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint (Unopposed) by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Matthew)
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Mitchell, Matthew)
November 27, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Mitchell, Matthew)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court GRANTS #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and defendants, Taylor and The Arevalo Agency shall file a response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by 12/8/2023. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/22/2023. (AHI)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Brittany Taylor, The Arevalo Agency LLC. (Wright, Grant)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #3 Motion for Extension of Time and Allstate's response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due by 12/8/2023. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/21/2023. (AHI)
November 20, 2023 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Friedman, Rachel)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/20/2023. (AHI)
November 17, 2023 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4472332 (B-8589). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Lauderdale County, Alabama, case number 41-CV-2023-900237, filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(LCB). (Mitchell, Matthew) Modified on 11/20/2023 (AHI).
November 16, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Lauderdale County, Alabama, case number 41-CV-2023-900237, filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker et al v. The Arevalo Agency LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erinn Baker
Represented By: Andrew Michael Herren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Baker
Represented By: Andrew Michael Herren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Arevalo Agency LLC
Represented By: Grant A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kermit L Kendrick
Represented By: Matthew T Mitchell
Represented By: Rachel R Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Kermit L Kendrick
Represented By: Matthew T Mitchell
Represented By: Rachel R Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Taylor
Represented By: Grant A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?