Pearson v. Travelers Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Joanne Pearson
Defendant: Travelers Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2011cv01846
Filed: May 31, 2011
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Middle Office
County: Etowah
Presiding Judge: Robert R Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 9/18/2014. (JLC)
March 31, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the plaintiff's objections are OVERRULED and the Magistrate Judge's order stands as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 3/31/2014. (AHI)
August 21, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the Court is of the opinion that the magistrate judge's report is due to be and hereby is ADOPTED and his recommendation is ACCEPTED. It is therefore ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 08/21/2013. (PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson v. Travelers Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Insurance Company
Represented By: Constance T Buckalew
Represented By: A David Fawal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Pearson
Represented By: Rose Marie Allenstein
Represented By: Myron K Allenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?