Townson v. Koch Farms, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Phil Townson
Defendant: Koch Farms of Chattanooga and Koch Farms, LLC
Case Number: 4:2013cv01703
Filed: September 12, 2013
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Middle Office
County: De Kalb
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 12/1/2014. (JLC)
August 19, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 21 MOTION for Relief from Order; TERMED AS MOOT 21 MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Order as set out herein. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 8/19/2014. (JLC)
April 22, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 11 MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment as set out herein. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 4/22/2014. (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Townson v. Koch Farms, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Farms of Chattanooga
Represented By: Kevin R Garrison
Represented By: Russell W Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Farms, LLC
Represented By: Russell W Gray
Represented By: Kevin R Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Townson
Represented By: Gary V Conchin
Represented By: Robert Dale Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?