Patton v. Etowah County, Alabama et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Patton
Defendant: Etowah County, Alabama, Todd Entrekin, Jonathan Shadwrick, Scott Hassell and Mike O'Bryant
Case Number: 4:2015cv00540
Filed: April 1, 2015
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Middle Office
County: Etowah
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment as set out herein. The case will be set for Pretrial Conference and Jury Trial by subsequent notice. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 12/13/2016. (JLC)
January 5, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 23 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Scott Hassell, Mike O'Bryant and Todd Entrekin, DENYING 21 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Jonathan Shadwrick. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 1/5/2016. (JLC)
September 9, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 8 10 12 MOTIONS to Dismiss. Plaintiff Kenneth Wayne Patton is hereby ORDERED to submit an amended complaint within 30 days of the entry date of this Order as set out herein. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 9/9/2015. (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patton v. Etowah County, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Patton
Represented By: Philip E Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etowah County, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Entrekin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Shadwrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Hassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike O'Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?