Watts v. Wells Fargo Dealer Services Inc

Plaintiff: Roger W Watts, Jr
Defendant: Wells Fargo Dealer Services Inc
Case Number: 4:2015cv02250
Filed: December 10, 2015
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Middle Office
County: Etowah
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The court GRANTS Wells Fargo's request for a preliminary injunction (docs. 28, 49) and ORDERS Mr. Watts to surrender possession of the 2011 BMW 750, VIN WBAKC8C56BC434525, to Wells Fargo at 200 Wildwood Parkway, Homewood, AL 35209 by Friday, October 28, 2016 at noon. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O. Bowdre on 10/25/16. (JAS)
October 25, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court For good cause shown, the court GRANTS Defendant's request for leave to amend (doc. 47) its Counter-complaint. Defendant must file its Amended Counter-complaint on or before Wednesday, October 26, 2016 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O. Bowdre on 10/25/16. (JAS)
July 20, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7/20/16. (SAC )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts v. Wells Fargo Dealer Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger W Watts, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Dealer Services Inc
Represented By: D Keith Andress
Represented By: Catherine C Long
Represented By: Jade E Sipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?