Catlin Syndicated Limited v. Ramuji, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Catlin Syndicated Limited
Defendant: Ramuji, LLC and Peoples Independent Bank
Counter_claimant: Ramuji, LLC
Counter_defendant: Catlin Syndicated Limited
Case Number: 4:2016cv01331
Filed: August 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Middle Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 386 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 371 - The court GRANTS the Agency Defendants' motion for reconsideration. On reconsideration, the court GRANTS the Agency Defendants' motion for summary judgment on Ramuji's breach of contract claim an d WILL ENTER SUMMARY JUDGMENT in favor of the Agency Defendants and against Ramuji on Count Three. The grant of summary judgment in favor of the Agency Defendants resolves the last remaining claim in this case. Accordingly, the court will enter a final judgment in accordance with this memorandum opinion and order. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 2/24/2020. (KEK)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 357 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - The court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART the Agency Defendants' motion for summary judgment. (Doc. 279 ). The court GRANT motion and WILL ENTER SUMMARY JUDGMENT in favor of the Agency Defendants and against Ram uji on Counts One, Two, and Four. The court DENIES the motion as to Count Three, which will proceed to trial. The court DENIES Ramuji's motion for summary judgment. (Doc. 269 ). The court will enter a separate partial judgment in accordance with this memorandum opinion and order. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/28/2020. (KEK)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 293 - The court WILL GRANT PIB's motion for partial summary judgment and WILL ENTER SUMMARY JUDGMENT in favor of PIB and against Ramuji and Mr. Desai as to their liability on PIB's claims for recovery under the promi ssory note, breach of contract, and breach of the guaranty. At PIB's request, the court will defer issuing a judgment on the exact amount of damages. The court will enter a separate partial judgment. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/4/2019. (KEK)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 4/8/2019. (TLM, )
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/29/2018. (TLM, )
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 147 MOTION to Amend/Correct 114 Amended Complaint, Third Amended Answer/Counterclaim/Third Party Claim, 165 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Third Amended Complain t/Answer. The Court DENIES the Motion for Reconsideration. The Court GRANTS the Motion to Amend Peoples Independent Banks Answer. The Court GRANTS the Motion to Amend the Third- Party Complaint. The Court GRANTS the Motion to add Cross-Claims again st Ramuji. The Court DIRECTS Peoples Independent Bank to file its third Amended Answer, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim, and Third-Party Complaint in accordance with this Order. That filing will become Peoples Independent Banks operative pleading. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/29/2018. (JLC)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER FINDING AS MOOT 128 MOTION for Summary Judgment, GRANTING 139 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Catlin Syndicate Limited is hereby ORDERED to file its Second Amended Complaint (and any attachments) into CM/ECF as a separate and distinct docket entry. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 4/18/2018. (JLC)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 100 MOTION to Dismiss as set out herein, The Jones/Pair 102 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED. The Jones/Pair 102 Motion To Dismiss for failure to state a justiciable controversy is TERMED as MOOT. Great American's Complaint against them is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 10/4/2017. (JLC)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 53 63 MOTIONS to Dismiss as set out herein. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 8/18/2017. (JLC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catlin Syndicated Limited v. Ramuji, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catlin Syndicated Limited
Represented By: Bradley R Sanders, Jr.
Represented By: A Grady Williams, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramuji, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Bridges Cole, Jr
Represented By: Gary V Conchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peoples Independent Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Ramuji, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Bridges Cole, Jr
Represented By: Gary V Conchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Catlin Syndicated Limited
Represented By: Bradley R Sanders, Jr.
Represented By: A Grady Williams, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?