Marshall County, Alabama et al v. Purdue Pharma L P et al Featured Case

Alabama filed a lawsuit against Purdue Pharma LP, maker of OxyContin, claiming the drug company is fueling the opioid epidemic by deceptively marketing prescription painkillers. Alabama further alleges that Purdue did not accurately portray the risks and benefits of opioids in order to encourage doctors to prescribe them in the treatment of pain.

Plaintiff: Marshall County, Alabama, Albertville, Alabama, City of, Arab, Alabama, Boaz, Alabama, City of, Guntersville, Alabama, The City of, Douglas, Alabama, The City of and Grant, Alabama, Town Of
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L P, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Pharma Inc, McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation and Insys Therapeutics Inc
Case Number: 4:2018cv00226
Filed: February 8, 2018
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Middle Office
County: Marshall
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL; docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in Northern District of Ohio. (SAC )
February 21, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by J Patrick Strubel on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, J)
February 21, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David L Brown, Jr on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, David)
February 21, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by H Lanier Brown, II on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, H)
February 20, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marshall County, Alabama et al., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018; Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018; Cephalon, Inc. served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018; Insys Therapeutics Inc served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018; McKesson Corporation served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018; Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018; Purdue Pharma Inc. served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018; Purdue Pharma L P served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018. (JLC)
February 16, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas, Alabama, The City of, Marshall County, Alabama, Boaz, Alabama, City of, Arab, Alabama, Albertville, Alabama, City of. Actavis Pharma Inc served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018; Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc. served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018. (JLC)
February 13, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L P, Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc. via certified U.S. Mail on this the 13th day of February, 2018.(JLC)
February 12, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING RULE 7.1. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 05/11/2016. (KWC)
February 12, 2018 3 Featured Case UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 2/12/2018. (KWC)
February 9, 2018 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Albertville, Alabama, City of, Arab, Alabama, Boaz, Alabama, City of, Douglas, Alabama, The City of, Grant, Alabama, Town Of, Guntersville, Alabama, The City of, Marshall County, Alabama. (Friedman, Jeffrey)
February 9, 2018 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3024212, NDAL receipt #B4601086661. (Friedman, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/9/2018 (JLC).
February 8, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L P, Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., filed by Douglas, Alabama, The City of, Guntersville, Alabama, The City of, Marshall County, Alabama, Boaz, Alabama, City of, Grant, Alabama, Town Of, Arab, Alabama, Albertville, Alabama, City of. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall County, Alabama et al v. Purdue Pharma L P et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall County, Alabama
Represented By: Randy H Beard
Represented By: Jeffrey E Friedman
Represented By: P J Harris, II
Represented By: Edward R Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albertville, Alabama, City of
Represented By: Randy H Beard
Represented By: Jeffrey E Friedman
Represented By: P J Harris, II
Represented By: Edward R Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arab, Alabama
Represented By: Randy H Beard
Represented By: Jeffrey E Friedman
Represented By: P J Harris, II
Represented By: Edward R Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boaz, Alabama, City of
Represented By: Randy H Beard
Represented By: Jeffrey E Friedman
Represented By: P J Harris, II
Represented By: Edward R Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guntersville, Alabama, The City of
Represented By: Randy H Beard
Represented By: Jeffrey E Friedman
Represented By: P J Harris, II
Represented By: Edward R Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas, Alabama, The City of
Represented By: Randy H Beard
Represented By: Jeffrey E Friedman
Represented By: P J Harris, II
Represented By: Edward R Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant, Alabama, Town Of
Represented By: Randy H Beard
Represented By: Jeffrey E Friedman
Represented By: P J Harris, II
Represented By: Edward R Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: David L Brown, Jr
Represented By: H Lanier Brown, II
Represented By: J Patrick Strubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?