Binh v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Petitioner: Nguyen Vo Binh
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 4:2018cv01223
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Middle Office
County: Etowah
0 Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
1 Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Consistent with the accompanying memorandum opinion, the Court grants the respondents motion to dismiss. (Doc. 4). The Court dismisses Mr. Binhs petition for a writ of habeas corpus as moot. The parties shall bear their respective costs. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/12/2018. (KEK)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/12/2018. (KEK)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Pitman Declaration)(Wilson, Sarah)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Stevens Wilson on behalf of Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Wilson, Sarah)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - It is hereby ORDERED that the respondent appear and show cause in writing within twenty (20) days from the date of this Order why the relief requested by petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/7/2018. (KEK)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number ALND B4601091052), filed by Nguyen Vo Binh.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Binh v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nguyen Vo Binh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?