Flores v. Hassell et al

Petitioner: Edson Flores
Respondent: Jeff Sessions and Scott . Hassell
Case Number: 4:2018cv01493
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
0 Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
1 Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER The petitioner shall have twenty-one days (21) days from the entry date of this Order to supply any additional evidentiary materials or legal arguments he may wish to offer with regard to whether the petition is subject to summary disposition. Thereafter, the Court will take the petition under advisement for consideration in light of the Governments answer and any additional materials supplied by the petitioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/6/2018. (TLM, )
November 5, 2018 7 RESPONSE to re #3 filed by Scott. Hassell, Jeff Sessions. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Balaban, Kate)
October 31, 2018 6 Opposition to any request of extension of time that could be made by respondents after the Courts order to show cause #5 filed by Edson Flores. (TLM, )
October 1, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE The respondent has filed a motion for extension of time (Doc. 4). For good cause shown, the motion is GRANTED. The respondent shall respond to the Order to Show Cause on or before November 5, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/1/2018. (TLM, )
September 30, 2018 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Order to Show Cause, #3 Order to Show Cause, by Scott. Hassell, Jeff Sessions. (Wilson, Sarah)
September 14, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (AMENDED)It is hereby ORDERED that the respondents appear and show cause in writing within twenty-one (21) days from the date of entry of this order why the relief requested by the petitioner should not be granted.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/14/2018. (TLM, )
September 14, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE It is hereby ORDERED that the respondents appear and show cause in writing within twenty-one (21) days from the date of entry of this order why the relief requested by the petitioner should not be granted.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/14/2018. (TLM, )
September 13, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.) Receipt #B4601091988, filed by Edson Flores.(TLM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. Hassell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Sessions
Represented By: Kate Deboer Balaban
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Represented By: Derek C Julius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott . Hassell
Represented By: Kate Deboer Balaban
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Represented By: Derek C Julius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edson Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?