National Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Rollins et al
Plaintiff: National Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Defendant: Dianna Rollins and Donald Scott
Case Number: 4:2018cv01864
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Donald Scott served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Bruce, David)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Dianna Rollins served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Bruce, David)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dianna Rollins and Donald Scott, returned to Plaintiff's attorney for service on this the 15th day of November, 2018. (JLC)
November 15, 2018 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3218323, NDAL receipt #B4601093518. (Bruce, David) Modified on 11/15/2018 (JLC).
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dianna Rollins, Donald Scott, filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Rollins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianna Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: David Lee Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?