Galloway v. TS Tech Alabama LLC

Plaintiff: Matthew Galloway
Defendant: TS Tech Alabama LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv01915
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS- with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/7/19. (SAC )
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TS Tech Alabama LLC. filed by TS Tech Alabama LLC (Warren, David)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by TS Tech Alabama LLC.(Warren, David)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Galloway. TS Tech Alabama LLC served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/1/2019. (Wrady, Joshua)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to TS Tech Alabama LLC. (TLM, )
November 30, 2018 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3227972, NDAL receipt #B4601093777.(Wrady, Joshua) Modified on 11/30/2018 (JLC).
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TS Tech Alabama LLC, filed by Matthew Galloway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(TLM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galloway v. TS Tech Alabama LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TS Tech Alabama LLC
Represented By: David L Warren, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Galloway
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Wrady
Represented By: Anthony David Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?