Southern Wholesale Fibers and Recycling, Inc. v. Evanston Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Southern Wholesale Fibers and Recycling, Inc.
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company, Thompson Insurance, Inc. and Robert W Grubbs
Case Number: 4:2019cv00049
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Rule 26 Report. The Rule 26 Report shall be filed, if necessary, 14 days after the court rules on the Motion to Remand and the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 3/8/2019. (KWC)
March 8, 2019 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Report of Parties' Planning Meeting by Evanston Insurance Company. (Hunter, Seth)
March 1, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to re #17 Evanston Ins. Response to Motion to Remand filed by Southern Wholesale Fibers and Recycling, Inc.. (Conchin, Gary)
March 1, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Terry Romans (Doc.10-1) filed by Southern Wholesale Fibers and Recycling, Inc.. (Conchin, Gary)
March 1, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to re #17 Evanston Ins.Response to Motion to Remand filed by Southern Wholesale Fibers and Recycling, Inc.. (Conchin, Gary)
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Ely, Brenen)
February 22, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Robert W Grubbs, Thompson Insurance, Inc.. (Ingram, Allison)
February 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Terry Romans (Doc.10-1) by Robert W Grubbs, Thompson Insurance, Inc.. (Ingram, Allison)
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert W Grubbs, Thompson Insurance, Inc.. (Ingram, Allison)
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendants Grubbs and Thompson filed by Southern Wholesale Fibers and Recycling, Inc.. (Conchin, Gary)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Motion To Suspend or Clarify. The Court "clarifies" that the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to the referenced motion to dismiss is determined as set out in this Court's Uniform Initial Order. In all other respects, the Motion To Suspend or Clarify is denied.Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 2/8/2019. (Hopkins, Virginia)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION To Suspend 12(b)6 Briefing by Southern Wholesale Fibers and Recycling, Inc.. (Conchin, Gary)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Southern Wholesale Fibers and Recycling, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Conchin, Gary)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by William H Brittain, II on behalf of Robert W Grubbs, Thompson Insurance, Inc. (Brittain, William)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Southern Wholesale Fibers and Recycling, Inc. (Conchin, Gary)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Robert W Grubbs, Thompson Insurance, Inc.. (Ingram, Allison)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Joinder in Removal by Robert W Grubbs, Thompson Insurance, Inc. (Ingram, Allison) Modified on 2/4/2019- not a motion (KWC)
January 10, 2019 Filing fee received in the amount of $400.00, credit card receipt_number 1126-3252728. USDC receipt number B4601094677; related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Evanston Insurance Company from Circuit Court of DeKalb County, Alabama, case number CV-2018-900331; filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet)(KWC). (Ely, Brenen) Modified on 1/10/2019 (KWC)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 1/9/2019. (KWC)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING RULE 7.1. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 05/11/2016. (KWC)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Evanston Insurance Company. (KWC)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Evanston Insurance Company.(KWC) Modified on 1/9/2019 (KWC)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Evanston Insurance Company from Circuit Court of DeKalb County, Alabama, case number CV-2018-900331; filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(KWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Wholesale Fibers and Recycling, Inc. v. Evanston Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Wholesale Fibers and Recycling, Inc.
Represented By: Franklin Taylor Rouse
Represented By: Gary V Conchin
Represented By: Kenneth Bridges Cole, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth T Hunter
Represented By: Brenen G Ely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson Insurance, Inc.
Represented By: William H Brittain, II
Represented By: Allison A Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W Grubbs
Represented By: William H Brittain, II
Represented By: Allison A Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?