Yebio v. Whitaker et al

Petitioner: Meron Tesfay Yebio
Respondent: Chief Warden ECDC Scott . Hassell, Secretary DHS Kirstjen Nielsen, US Attorney General Matthew Whitaker and Field Office Dir ICE David Rivera
Case Number: 4:2019cv00075
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
0 Judge: Herman N Johnson
1 Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Respondent's Order to Show Cause to the Honorable Court Dated 2/6/2019 filed by Meron Tesfay Yebio. (AFS)
February 12, 2019 MOTION of respondents treating response #3 as a motion for summary judgment pursuant to #6 . (AFS)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER The court deems this case ripe for summary disposition on the basis of the defenses asserted in the respondent's response #3 . Petitioner has 20 days from the date of this order to supply any additional evidentiary materials or legal arguments he may wish to offer with regard to whether the petition is subject to summary disposition. Thereafter, the court will take the petition under advisement for consideration in light of the respondent's answer and exhibits and any additional materials supplied by the petitioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/12/2019. (AFS)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Corrected CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Scott. Hassell, Kirstjen Nielsen, David Rivera, Matthew Whitaker re #3 Response (other) (Wilson, Sarah)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Stevens Wilson on behalf of All Defendants (Wilson, Sarah)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE to the Court's Order to Show Cause #2 filed by Scott. Hassell, Kirstjen Nielsen, David Rivera, Matthew Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Pitman Declaration)(Wilson, Sarah)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Respondents are ORDERED to appear and show cause in writing within 20 days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by Petitioner shouldn't be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 1/23/2019. (AFS)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5.00 ALND B4601094762), filed by Meron Tesfay Yebio.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yebio v. Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chief Warden ECDC Scott . Hassell
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary DHS Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Attorney General Matthew Whitaker
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Field Office Dir ICE David Rivera
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Meron Tesfay Yebio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?