Leconte v. Horton et al

Petitioner: Cliff Emmanuel Leconte
Respondent: Johnathon Horton, Matthew Whitaker, David Rivera and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 4:2019cv00228
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - For the reasons set forth herein, the magistrate judge RECOMMENDS that the petition be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 4/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/3/2019. (KEK)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Court's #5 Order filed by Cliff Emmanuel Leconte. (JLC)
March 4, 2019 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Treating Respondents' #4 Response as a Motion for Summary Judgment pursuant to the Court's #5 Order. (JLC)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER notifying Petitioner that this case will be treated by the Court as ripe for summary disposition. Petitioner shall have twenty-one days (21) days from the entry date of this Order to supply any additional evidentiary materials or legal arguments he may wish to offer with regard to whether the petition is subject to summary disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/4/2019. (JLC)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to re #1 , #2 filed by Johnathon Horton, Kirstjen Nielsen, David Rivera, Matthew Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: North Declaration)(Wilson, Sarah)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Stevens Wilson on behalf of Johnathon Horton, Kirstjen Nielsen, David Rivera, Matthew Whitaker (Wilson, Sarah)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Respondents are hereby ORDERED to APPEAR and SHOW CAUSE in writing, within twenty-one (21) days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by the Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/8/2019. (JLC)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5.00 receipt #B4601095266), filed by Cliff Emmanuel Leconte.(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leconte v. Horton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Johnathon Horton
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Whitaker
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Rivera
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cliff Emmanuel Leconte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?