Broadcast Music Inc et al v. CJs Saloon LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bocephus Music Inc, Springtime Music Inc, Cotillion Music Inc, Blame Music, ARC/Conrad Music LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Rondor Music International Inc, Songs of Universal Inc, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc, Leahrae Music Co, Broadcast Music Inc and Manchaca Music
Defendant: CJs Saloon LLC and Cynthia R Dewberry
Case Number: 4:2019cv00648
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants CJ's Saloon LLC and Cynthia R Dewberry. (KEK)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default by ARC/Conrad Music LLC, Blame Music, Bocephus Music Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, Cotillion Music Inc, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc, Leahrae Music Co, Manchaca Music, Rondor Music International Inc, Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Springtime Music Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James P Pewitt)(Pewitt, James)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - To date, the Defendants have not filed a responsive pleading or otherwise appeared in this action, and Plaintiffs have not moved for entry of default.Accordingly, on or before July 10, 2019, Plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE in writing why the court should not dismiss this action for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/1/2019. (KEK)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING letter from Defendant Cynthia R Dewberry by ARC/Conrad Music LLC, Blame Music, Bocephus Music Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, Cotillion Music Inc, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc, Leahrae Music Co, Manchaca Music, Rondor Music International Inc, Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Springtime Music Inc (Pewitt, James) Modified docket text on 6/11/2019 (KEK).
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leahrae Music Co, Bocephus Music Inc, Songs of Universal Inc, Manchaca Music, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc, Springtime Music Inc, Rondor Music International Inc, Cotillion Music Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, ARC/Conrad Music LLC, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Blame Music. CJs Saloon LLC served (no date on green card); Cynthia R Dewberry served (no date on green card). (KEK)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CJs Saloon LLC, Cynthia R Dewberry. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by ARC/Conrad Music LLC, Blame Music, Bocephus Music Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, Cotillion Music Inc, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc, Leahrae Music Co, Manchaca Music, Rondor Music International Inc, Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Springtime Music Inc. (Pewitt, James)
May 3, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3338417 (ALND B4601097285) related document #1 COMPLAINT against CJs Saloon LLC, Cynthia R Dewberry, filed by Leahrae Music Co, Bocephus Music Inc, Songs of Universal Inc, Manchaca Music, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc, Springtime Music Inc, Rondor Music International Inc, Cotillion Music Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, ARC/Conrad Music LLC, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Blame Music.(KEK). (Pewitt, James) Modified on 5/6/2019 (KEK).
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ARC/Conrad Music LLC, Blame Music, Bocephus Music Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, Cotillion Music Inc, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc, Leahrae Music Co, Manchaca Music, Rondor Music International Inc, Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Springtime Music Inc (KEK)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CJs Saloon LLC, Cynthia R Dewberry, filed by Leahrae Music Co, Bocephus Music Inc, Songs of Universal Inc, Manchaca Music, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc, Springtime Music Inc, Rondor Music International Inc, Cotillion Music Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, ARC/Conrad Music LLC, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Blame Music.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music Inc et al v. CJs Saloon LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bocephus Music Inc
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Springtime Music Inc
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cotillion Music Inc
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blame Music
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARC/Conrad Music LLC
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International Inc
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal Inc
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Escatawpa Songs LLC
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fourteenth Hour Music Inc
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leahrae Music Co
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Inc
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manchaca Music
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJs Saloon LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia R Dewberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?