Smith v. Street et al

Plaintiff: Tony Lee Smith
Defendant: Fred Lawton, III, Malcolm B Street, Jr, Kim McCarson, Eric Neal Snyder, Carol Lynn Hammond, Jacob Argo, Lewis Lafoy and Brett Williams
Case Number: 4:2019cv00751
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Carol Lynn Hammond, Fred Lawton, III, Kim McCarson, Eric Neal Snyder, Malcolm B Street, Jr, Jacob Argo, Brett Williams, Lewis Lafoy, filed by Tony Lee Smith.(KAM)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the court having received prisoner consent form the Warden is directed to deduct Monthly Payments from Prison Account of Tony Lee Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/18/2019. (KAM)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO AMEND - plaintiff must correct the deficient complaint within 20 days as set out in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/18/2019. (KAM)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Consent Form filed by Tony Lee Smith. (KAM)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER terming motion or declaration for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is not required to pay a partial filing fee, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 5/30/2019. (KAM)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony Lee Smith. (KEK)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carol Lynn Hammond, Fred Lawton, III, Kim McCarson, Eric Neal Snyder, Malcolm B Street, Jr, filed by Tony Lee Smith.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Street et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Lawton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm B Street, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim McCarson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Neal Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Lynn Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Argo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Lafoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Lee Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?