Morgan v. Warden Etowah County Jail

Petitioner: Lansville Colin Morgan
Respondent: Warden Etowah County Jail
Case Number: 4:2019cv00768
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Karon O Bowdre
2 Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Warden Etowah County Jail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 06/26/19 Ninth Circuit Order Denying Stay Motion)(Tucker, Colin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 REFERRAL REASSIGNMENT to Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden. Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Respondent's #5 Response filed by Lansville Colin Morgan. (JLC)
June 12, 2019 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Treating Respondents' #5 Response as a Motion for Summary Judgment pursuant to the Court's #6 Order. (JLC)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER notifying Petitioner that this case will be treated by the Court as ripe for summary disposition. Petitioner shall have twenty-one days (21) days from the entry date of this Order to supply any additional evidentiary materials or legal arguments he may wish to offer with regard to whether the petition is subject to summary disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/12/2019. (JLC)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause filed by Warden Etowah County Jail. (Tucker, Colin)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin James Tucker on behalf of Warden Etowah County Jail (Tucker, Colin)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; It is hereby ORDERED that the Respondent APPEAR and SHOW CAUSE in writing, within twenty (20) days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by the Petitioner should not be granted. Because Petitioner paid the filing fee, his #2 MOTION for leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/22/2019. (JLC)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Lansville Colin Morgan. (JLC)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5.00 receipt #B4601097844), filed by Lansville Colin Morgan.(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Warden Etowah County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Etowah County Jail
Represented By: Colin James Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lansville Colin Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?