Parker v. F.H. Cann & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Meredith Parker
Defendant: F.H. Cann & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00808
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted (certified mail) as to F.H. Cann & Associates, Inc.; UNCLAIMED; RETURN TO SENDER; UNABLE TO FORWARD. (KWC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: Case Reassigned to Judge Corey L Maze from the Unassigned Judge A civil cases (KAM)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to F.H. Cann & Associates, Inc. mailed certified mail. (KAM)
May 29, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3355903, NDAL receipt #B4601097996. (Seals, W) Modified on 5/29/2019 (JLC).
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against F.H. Cann & Associates, Inc., filed by Meredith Parker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. F.H. Cann & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith Parker
Represented By: W Whitney Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.H. Cann & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?