Colino v. Warden, Etowah Detention Center
Petitioner: Reginaldo Colino
Respondent: Warden, Etowah Detention Center and Attorney General William Barr
Case Number: 4:2019cv00827
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: L Scott Coogler
2 Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by William Barr, Jay E. Town (Marshall, Mary)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to Court that Petitioner hasn't received any documents by Reginaldo Colino. (JLC)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by William Barr, Jay E. Town. filed by William Barr, Jay E. Town (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Pitman Declaration)(Marshall, Mary)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of William Barr, Jay E. Town (Marshall, Mary)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER On June 3, 2019, the respondent was ordered to appear and show cause in writing within twenty-one days why the relief requested by petitioner should not be granted. #2 . Now pending before the court is the respondent's motion for an extension of time to respond. #4 . The respondent's motion is GRANTED to the extent that the deadline to respond to the show cause order is extended to June 28, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/24/2019. (PSM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time by William Barr. (Long, Don)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 REFERRAL REASSIGNMENT to Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden. Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE This is an action on a petition for writ of habeas corpus brought pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 by Reginaldo Colino. Petitioner challenges the legality of his continued detention by federal immigration authorities pending his removal from the United States under the Immigration and Nationality Act, 8 U.S.C. 1101 et seq. (See #1 ). It is hereby ORDERED that the respondent appear and SHOW CAUSE in writing within twenty-one (21) days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 6/3/2019. (PSM)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5.00 receipt #B4601098038), filed by Reginaldo Colino.(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colino v. Warden, Etowah Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reginaldo Colino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Etowah Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General William Barr
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Represented By: Don B Long, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?