Ceren v. Benner et al
Petitioner: Hugo Hernandez Ceren and Hugo Ceren-Hernandez
Respondent: Sheriff Jonathan Horthan, Phillips T Miller, Ms Asher, Kirstjen Nielsen, William P. Barr, John Kelly and Mr Benner
Case Number: 4:2019cv00843
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Hugo Ceren-Hernandez. Objections to R&R due by 7/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/16/2019. (JLC)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to re #4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Hugo Ceren-Hernandez. (AFS)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER the Petitioner has paid the filing fee; therefore, the motion to proceed in forma pauperis is MOOT. The motion for appointment of counsel #3 is premature at this time and, therefore, DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The petitioner is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing within 20 days from the entry of this Order, why his petition should not be dismissed as premature. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/10/2019. (AFS)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Hugo Hernandez Ceren. (AFS)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hugo Hernandez Ceren. (AFS)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5. ALND B4601098108), filed by Hugo Hernandez Ceren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ceren v. Benner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Jonathan Horthan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Phillips T Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ms Asher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mr Benner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hugo Hernandez Ceren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hugo Ceren-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?