Hernandez v. Warden
Petitioner: Alex Giovanni Hernandez
Respondent: Warden and William P Barr
Case Number: 4:2019cv00853
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Respondents are ORDERED to file a status report including the petitioner's custody status by 8/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/2/2019. (KAM)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to re #6 filed by Alex Giovanni Hernandez. (KAM)
July 19, 2019 MOTION for Summary Judgment - response #6 treated as a motion for summary judgment pusuant to Order #7 . (KAM)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER the response to the petition will be treated as a motion for summary judgment; petitioner shall have 21 days to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 7/19/2019. (KAM)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by William P Barr. filed by William P Barr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Martin Declaration)(Marshall, Mary)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of William P Barr (Marshall, Mary)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SHOW CAUSE ORDER the Respondent is ORDERED to show cause in writing within 30 days, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/19/2019. (AFS)
June 14, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number B4601098450 (KAM)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING - petitioner shall within 30 days either file an application to proceed ifp or pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/7/2019. (KAM)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alex Giovanni Hernandez. (KAM) Filing fee paid. Modified on 7/19/2019 (KAM, ).
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Alex Giovanni Hernandez.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alex Giovanni Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?