Golding v. Warden et al
Petitioner: Karim Golding
Respondent: Warden and Attorney General of the United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00854
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Karim Golding. (KEK)
August 1, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number B4601099537. (KEK)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Petitioner is ORDERED to supply the court with his correct, current mailing address and inform the court as to whether he wishes to continue prosecuting this action within twenty-one (21) days of the entry date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 7/11/2019. (KEK)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Karim Goulding (Doc 2). (KEK)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Karim Goulding (case number notice). (KEK)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING - Petitioner Karim Goldings pleading is deficient for the reasons indicated below. Petitioner must correct the deficient pleading within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this Order. Petitioner failed to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or to pay the filing fee of $5.00. Petitioner must either file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee of $5.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/10/2019. (KEK)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Karim Golding.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golding v. Warden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karim Golding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?