Aregay v. Rivera et al
Petitioner: Rezene Gidena Aregay
Respondent: Scott Hassell, William P Barr, David Rivera and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 4:2019cv00866
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail Memorandum Opinion #8 and Order #9 sent to Rezene Gidena Aregay returned (Refused unable to forward). (AFS)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Consistent with the accompanying memorandum opinion #8 , the court GRANTS Respondents' motion to dismiss #4 , and DISMISSES this matter as MOOT. The parties shall bear their respective costs. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/11/2019. (AFS)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION Having carefully reviewed and considered de novo all the materials in the court file, including the report and recommendation, the magistrate judges report is hereby ADOPTED and the recommendation is ACCEPTED. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/11/2019. (AFS)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail R & R #6 sent to Rezene Gidena Aregay Return to Sender (Refused unable to forward} (AFS)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION the undersigned RECOMMENDS this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Petitioner my file specific written objections to this report and recommendation within 14 days from the date the report and recommendation is entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/19/2019. (AFS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail Order #2 , Notice of Filing sent to Rezene Gidena Aregay returned as no mail receptacle unable to forward. (AFS)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss as Moot by William P Barr, Kirstjen Nielsen, David Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Long, Don)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Don B Long, III on behalf of William P Barr, Kirstjen Nielsen, David Rivera (Long, Don)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER it is ORDERED that Respondents appear and show cause in writing within 20 days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/10/2019. (AFS)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5. ALND B4601098206), filed by Rezene Gidena Aregay.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aregay v. Rivera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Hassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Represented By: Don B Long, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Rivera
Represented By: Don B Long, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Don B Long, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rezene Gidena Aregay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?