Nunez-Aguilar v. Warden, Etowah County Jail
Petitioner: Jimmy Humberto Nunez-Aguilar
Respondent: Warden, Etowah County Jail and William P Barr
Case Number: 4:2019cv00907
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT by William P Barr. filed by William P Barr (Marshall, Mary)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William P Barr re #8 Response to Order to Show Cause Amended Certificate of Service (Marshall, Mary)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the Respondent are to to file a Status Report including the Petitioner's custody status by August 9, 2019. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this Order on the Respondent and on the Petitioner at the address reflected on the Fourth Circuit's docket sheet, c/o Recina Elisabeth Funes, Apt. B, 39 Tahoe Circle, Owings MD 21117. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 8/1/2019. (JLC)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Return To Sender, released written on envelope. Mail sent to Jimmy Humberto Nunez-Aguilar re #9 Order. (JLC)
July 3, 2019 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Treating Respondents' #8 Response as a Motion for Summary Judgment pursuant to the Court's #9 Order. (JLC)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER notifying Petitioner that this case will be treated by the Court as ripe for summary disposition and to further inform the Petitioner of his right to file affidavits or other materials to show why the petition should not be summarily denied or dismissed on the basis of the answer and record supplied by the Respondents. Petitioner shall have twenty (20) days from the date of this Order to supply any additional evidentiary materials or legal arguments he may wish to offer with regard to whether the petition is subject to summary disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 7/3/2019. (JLC)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by William P Barr. filed by William P Barr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit North Declaration)(Marshall, Mary)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of William P Barr (Marshall, Mary)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to resend a copy of its Notice and receipt to the petitioner at his address of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/25/2019. (JLC)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Released 6/10/19 written on envelope. Mail sent to Jimmy Humberto Nunez-Aguilar re #2 Order. (JLC)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to resend a copy of its Notice and receipt to the petitioner at his address of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/21/2019. (JLC)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jimmy Humberto Nunez-Aguilar re Notice of filing new case and receipt. (JLC)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; It is hereby ORDERED that the Respondent APPEAR and SHOW CAUSE in writing, within twenty (20) days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by the Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/13/2019. (JLC)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5.00 receipt $B4601098392), filed by Jimmy Humberto Nunez-Aguilar.(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunez-Aguilar v. Warden, Etowah County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Etowah County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jimmy Humberto Nunez-Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?